Heckman et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Vivian Heckman and Doug Heckman
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00039
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Memorandum of Law In Support by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint" (Doc. #13) is GRANTED. Defendant may file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before March 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 2/20/2020. (ZRN)
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Joint Motion to Permit Telephonic Attendance of Case Management Conference" (Doc. #11) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 2/20/2020. (ZRN)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically by Doug Heckman, Vivian Heckman. (Tucker, John)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. United Healthcare Insurance Company answer or response due 2/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/29/2020. (Porcelli, Anthony) Modified on 1/29/2020 (Porcelli, Anthony).
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Leo Vanlandingham on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company (Vanlandingham, James)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Pegg, Allen)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen Paige Pegg on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company (Pegg, Allen)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on January 10, 2020 by Doug Heckman, Vivian Heckman as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Tucker, John)
January 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 1/10/2020. (SRC)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (LD)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-39-T-60AEP. (SJB)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Healthcare Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16320669) filed by Doug Heckman, Vivian Heckman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A part 1, #4 Exhibit A part 2)(Tucker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heckman et al v. United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Heckman
Represented By: John V. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Heckman
Represented By: John V. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Allen Paige Pegg
Represented By: James Leo Vanlandingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?