Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC et al
Appellant: The Leiter Group, LLC, The Leiter Group, Attorneys and Counselors, P.C., Matthew T. Leiter, Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC and Thomas E. Leiter
Appellee: D.J. Mahoney CO., Michael Mahoney, Central Property Development, Inc., William Tompkins, Mark Cramer, The Southby Partnership, LTD., James M. Grant and Janet K. O'Neill
In Re: Palm Avenue Partners, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00040
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. New case number: 8:20-cv-40-T-36. Judge William F. Jung no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring case to the Honorable Charlene E. Honeywell in accord with attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/7/2020. (CCB)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Appeals and Stay Deadlines by Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC, Matthew T. Leiter, Thomas E. Leiter, The Leiter Group, Attorneys and Counselors, P.C., The Leiter Group, LLC. (Leonard, Anne)
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice by Central Property Development, Inc., Mark Cramer, D.J. Mahoney CO., James M. Grant, Michael Mahoney, Janet K. O'Neill, The Southby Partnership, LTD., William Tompkins. (Maglich, David)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Central Property Development, Inc., Mark Cramer, D.J. Mahoney CO., James M. Grant, Michael Mahoney, Janet K. O'Neill, The Southby Partnership, LTD., William Tompkins. Related case(s): yes (Maglich, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice by Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC, Matthew T. Leiter, Thomas E. Leiter, The Leiter Group, Attorneys and Counselors, P.C., The Leiter Group, LLC. (Leonard, Anne)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases or Other Actions per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC, Matthew T. Leiter, Thomas E. Leiter, The Leiter Group, Attorneys and Counselors, P.C., The Leiter Group, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Leonard, Anne)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/13/2020. (SAO)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC, Matthew T. Leiter, Thomas E. Leiter, The Leiter Group, Attorneys and Counselors, P.C., The Leiter Group, LLC. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:12-bk-9808-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Leiter Group, LLC
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Leiter Group, Attorneys and Counselors, P.C.
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Matthew T. Leiter
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Beacon Homes of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Thomas E. Leiter
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: D.J. Mahoney CO.
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Mahoney
Represented By: Brigid Anne Merenda
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Central Property Development, Inc.
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William Tompkins
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mark Cramer
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Southby Partnership, LTD.
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James M. Grant
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Janet K. O'Neill
Represented By: David S. Maglich
Represented By: Brendon A. McQuaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Palm Avenue Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?