Robson 200, LLC v. City of Lakeland et al
Plaintiff: Robson 200, LLC
Defendant: Veronica Rountree, William Wainwright, Angela Kaiser, Bill Wheeler, Jack Strollo, Glea Devrieze, Dana Kelley, Lakeland Code Enforcement Board, Rick Garrity, City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne and Sandy Toledo
Case Number: 8:2020cv00161
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
2 Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/10/2021 to edit text (CRH).
September 10, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/10/2021 to edit text (CRH).
September 10, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion, #38 Deposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/10/2021 to edit text (CRH).
September 10, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC re #48 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/10/2021 to edit text (CRH).
September 9, 2021 Filing 53 STIPULATION of Agreed Facts by Robson 200, LLC. (Holmes, Brandon)
September 9, 2021 Filing 52 ***STRICKEN; DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 26*** NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Brandon) (CRH). Modified on 9/10/2021 to strike as discovery (CRH).
September 9, 2021 Filing 51 ***STRICKEN; DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 26*** NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Brandon) (CRH). Modified on 9/10/2021 to strike as discovery (CRH).
September 9, 2021 Filing 50 ***STRICKEN; DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 26*** NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/10/2021 to strike as discovery (CRH).
September 9, 2021 Filing 49 ***STRICKEN; DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO RULE 26*** NOTICE by Robson 200, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Holmes, Brandon) Modified on 9/10/2021 to strike as discovery (CRH).
September 9, 2021 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Oral Argument filed by Robson 200, LLC. (Holmes, Brandon)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response and stipulation of material facts due September 9, 2021. Reply due September 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/3/2021. (NPC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 46 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Agreed Material Facts and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by All Defendants. (Jones, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response to the motion for summary judgment due by 9/3/2021. Any replies are due by 9/17/2021. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/11/2021. (NPC)
August 11, 2021 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Robson 200, LLC. (Holmes, Brandon)
July 14, 2021 Filing 43 DEPOSITION of ANUJ VAISH taken on 04/27/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 42 DEPOSITION of BRIAN REWIS taken on 04/06/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 41 DEPOSITION of ANGELA KAISER taken on 03/24/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 40 DEPOSITION of MICHAEL DEMAR INGRAM taken on 04/23/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 39 DEPOSITION of JIM DEHNE taken on 03/30/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 38 DEPOSITION of JONATHAN BURGOS CRUZ taken on 04/22/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 37 DEPOSITION of DAVID ANDERS taken on 04/19/2021 re #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) Modified on 7/15/2021 to edit text (CRH).
July 14, 2021 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of TAMMY TISON re: #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
July 14, 2021 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of BRIAN REWIS re: #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
July 14, 2021 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of ANGELA KAISER re: #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS A-R)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
July 14, 2021 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of JIM DEHNE re: #32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
July 14, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER granting #30 unopposed motion for judicial notice. The Court takes judicial notice of the documents described in and attached to the defendants' motion. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/14/2021. (DMP)
July 13, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding state court filings by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2017CA-1653, #2 Exhibit 2018CA-5102, #3 Exhibit 2018CA-5114)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 motion for extension of time. The dispositive-motion deadline is now July 14, 2021. All other deadlines remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/21/2021. (DMP)
June 18, 2021 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by All Defendants. (Jones, Matthew)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Defendants' Motion for Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline and Time to Conduct Deposition. The discovery deadline is extended to May 19, 2021. Defendants are granted two additional hours to depose Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) representative for the purpose of clarifying and authenticating exhibits to the deposition. This extension shall not constitute a basis to extend the dispositive motion deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on May 7, 2021. (BRC)
May 3, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and time to conduct deposition by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Jones, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Added MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically time to conduct deposition on 5/4/2021 (CRH).
April 6, 2021 Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2021 at 01:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13 B before Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle. (BSN)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER setting final Pretrial Conference and pretrial deadlines. Pretrial Conference set for December 2, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. in Tampa Courtroom 13B. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/5/2021. (DMP)
March 30, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Jones on behalf of City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne (an individual ), Angela Kaiser (an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Jones, Matthew) Modified on 3/30/2021 to edit text (CRH).
February 9, 2021 Filing 23 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 2-9-21. Hearing outcome: Impasse. (Barker, Chris) Modified on 2/9/2021 to edit text (CRH).
January 7, 2021 Filing 22 Case Reassigned to Judge Kathryn K. Mizelle. New case number: 8:20-cv-00161-210JSS. Judge Mary S. Scriven no longer assigned to the case. (CRH)
August 10, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 2/9/2021 9:30 a.m. before Chris A. Barker. (Holmes, Brandon)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 11/8/2021. Jury Trial set for the January 2022 trial term, which commences on 1/3/2022, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 2/16/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/16/2020. (KAC)
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Holmes, Brandon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Robson 200, LLC. (Holmes, Brandon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robson 200, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Holmes, Brandon)
June 30, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #13 Order Concerning Civil Cases by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board. (Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #14 Amended Complaint by City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(In his capacity as code enforcement supervisor), Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Angela Kaiser(an individual), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board.(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Equitable Relief and Demand for Jury Trial against City of Lakeland, Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(In her capacity as code enforcement officer), Lakeland Code Enforcement Board with Jury Demand. filed by Robson 200, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Holmes, Brandon)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Concerning Civil Cases: Case Management and Scheduling Orders. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/19/2020. (KE)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, and IV of the Complaint and/or Strike and Request to take Judicial Notice filed by All Defendants. The Court takes judicial notice of the opinion issued in the state court action on appeal of the Code Enforcement Decision and the limited level of review permitted on that appeal. Accordingly, the Court Grants the Motion to Dismiss as to each individual Defendant sued only in their official capacity. Those claims are duplicative of the claims against the City and the Code Enforcement Board. The Court GRANTS the Motion to the extent that any allegations seek redress for a violation of Plaintiff's procedural due process rights, which were fully addressed and finally resolved on the state court appeal. Otherwise the Motion to Dismiss and/or Strike is DENIED. Within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall refile the Complaint, removing any reference to individual Defendants other than the City of Lakeland, the Code Enforcement Board and Defendants Kaiser and Dehne. The Defendants will have fourteen (14) days thereafter to file an answer. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/14/2020.(Scriven, Mary)
April 3, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, and IV of the Complaint and/or Strike and Request to take Judicial Notice MOTION to Strike filed by Robson 200, LLC. (Lambert, Jason)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER concerning Jury Trials and Other Proceedings in re: Coronavirus Public Emergency. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/19/2020. (SMS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, and IV of the Complaint and/or Strike and Request to take Judicial Notice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Appellant's Initial Brief, #2 Exhibit Appellant's Reply Brief, #3 Exhibit Appellant's Appendix, #4 Exhibit Answer Brief of Appellee, #5 Exhibit Opinion of the Court, #6 Exhibit Court docket)(Hatcher-Bolin, Kristie) . Added MOTION to Strike on 3/12/2020 (JNB).
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Jim Dehne(an individual ), Angela Kaiser(an individual). (JNB)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Robson 200, LLC. (Lambert, Jason)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Robson 200, LLC. (Lambert, Jason)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MCB)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/24/2020. (MR)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/7/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/24/2020. (MR)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-161-T-35JSS. (SJB)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16383385) filed by Robson 200, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons Summons - City of Lakeland, #9 Proposed Summons Summons - Lakeland Code Enforcement Board, #10 Proposed Summons Summons - Toldeo, #11 Proposed Summons Summons - Garrity, #12 Proposed Summons Summons - Devrieze, #13 Proposed Summons Summons - Rountree, #14 Proposed Summons Summons - Strollo, #15 Proposed Summons Summons - Wheeler, #16 Proposed Summons Summons - Kelly, #17 Proposed Summons Summons - Wainwright, #18 Proposed Summons Summons - Dehne, #19 Proposed Summons Summons - Kaiser)(Lambert, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robson 200, LLC v. City of Lakeland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robson 200, LLC
Represented By: Jason S. Lambert
Represented By: Brandon Todd Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Rountree
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wainwright
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Kaiser
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Wheeler
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Strollo
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glea Devrieze
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Kelley
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeland Code Enforcement Board
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Garrity
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lakeland
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dehne
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Toledo
Represented By: Kristie Hatcher-Bolin
Represented By: Matthew David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?