Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bollea et al
Plaintiff: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Cox Enterprises, Terry Gene Bollea, Cox Radio, Inc., Michael Calta, Matthew Loyd, Matthew Christian Loyd and Cox Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00221
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance and Waiver of Service of Summons Appearance by Shane B. Vogt on behalf of Terry Gene Bollea (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vogt, Shane)
March 25, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Joshua L. Blosveren re #24 Reply to Response to Motion by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blosveren, Joshua)
March 25, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc.. (Blosveren, Joshua)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Defendants may file a 7-page reply no later than March 25, 2020. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/19/2020. (SMB)
March 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to File Reply by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Blosveren, Joshua) Modified text on 3/19/2020 (BSN).
March 18, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Johnson, Stephen) Modified text on 3/18/2020 (BSN).
March 11, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Johnson, Stephen)
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of compliance re 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Filing Fee and Electronic Requirements by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Hearing, Gregory)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer for Venue and Memorandum of Law in Support by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joshua L. Blosveren, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew N. Bourne)(Hearing, Gregory) Modified text on 2/27/2020 (BSN).
February 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Steven Silverberg (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA0560194.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Steven Silverberg to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
February 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Andrew Bourne (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060194.) Related document: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Bourne to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
February 26, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Joshua Blosveren (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060194.) Related document: #14 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua Blosveren to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Steven Silverberg, Andrew Bourne, and Joshua Blosveren may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, Cox Radio, Inc. and Cox Enterprises, Inc., with Attorney Gregory A. Hearing designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing requirement and file a notice of compliance with said requirement.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 2/25/2020. (NCR)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Steven Silverberg to appear pro hac vice by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text and removed image to Exhibit on 2/26/2020 (BSN).
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Andrew Bourne to appear pro hac vice by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text, removed exhibit on 2/26/2020 (BSN).
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua Blosveren to appear pro hac vice by Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hearing, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text and removed exhibit image on 2/26/2020 (BSN).
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Hearing on behalf of Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc. (Hearing, Gregory)
February 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Terry Gene Bollea. (BSN)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Michael Calta, Cox Enterprises, Inc., Cox Radio, Inc., Matthew Christian Loyd. (BSN)
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Johnson, Stephen)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 1/31/2020. (KAC)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Johnson, Stephen)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Stephen Hunter Johnson of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-221-T-30SPF. (SJB)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16408003) filed by Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc. v. Bollea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Gene Bollea
Represented By: Shane B. Vogt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Radio, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua L Blosveren
Represented By: Charles J. Thomas
Represented By: Steven M. Silverberg
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Calta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Christian Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua L Blosveren
Represented By: Charles J. Thomas
Represented By: Steven M. Silverberg
Represented By: Andrew N. Bourne
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hiscox Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Hunter Johnson
Represented By: Shawn Llamar Marquise Hairston, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?