Coeyman Jr. v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Coeyman,Jr. and Charles Coeyman Jr.
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00242
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER concerning Jury Trials and Other Proceedings in re: Coronavirus Public Emergency. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/19/2020. (SMS)
March 6, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc..(Knox, Steven)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/4/2020. (MWC)
March 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of settlement with Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC only by Charles Coeyman Jr. (Geiger, Bryan)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #16 Defendant Quicken Loans Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Quicken Loans Inc. shall have up to and including March 5, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/24/2020. (MWC)
February 24, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Knox, Steven)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James Kirby McDonough on behalf of Quicken Loans, Inc. (McDonough, James)
February 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Douglas Knox on behalf of Quicken Loans, Inc. (Knox, Steven)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Charles Coeyman Jr.. (Geiger, Bryan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Charles Coeyman Jr.. Related case(s): no (Geiger, Bryan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #8 Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC shall have up to and including March 25, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/19/2020. (MWC)
February 18, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.. (Love, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Related case(s): no (Love, John)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, John)
February 17, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on February 5, 2020 by Charles Coeyman Jr. as to Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Geiger, Bryan)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on February 4, 2020 by Charles Coeyman Jr. as to Quicken Loans, Inc.. (Geiger, Bryan)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/3/2020. (MR)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/18/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/3/2020. (MR)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Quicken Loans, Inc. (MCB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-242-T-35AAS. (SJB)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113A-16422843) filed by Charles Coeyman Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Geiger, Bryan) Modified on 2/3/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coeyman Jr. v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Anthony Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: James Kirby McDonough
Represented By: Steven Douglas Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Coeyman,Jr.
Represented By: Bryan James Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Coeyman Jr.
Represented By: Bryan James Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?