Sierra Club et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Rametta and Sierra Club
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, Todd T. Semonite, Andrew D Kelly and Andrew Kelly
Intervenor Defendant: Pasco County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 8:2020cv00287
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers. Related case(s): No (Costello, Sara)
March 17, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pasco County Board of County Commissioners. Related case(s): No (Aschauer, Frederick)
March 17, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #34 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Daniel Rametta, Sierra Club. Related case(s): No (Mehaffey, Heidi)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction 2 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/16/2020. (LJB)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/27/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/13/2020. (BGS)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Motion. A separate order will be entered re-designating this case as a Track One Case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/13/2020. (CEH)
March 13, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Re-designate as Track One Case on behalf of all Parties by All Plaintiffs. (Mehaffey, Heidi) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
March 5, 2020 Filing 31 PROOF of service by Daniel Rametta, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Service Letters, #2 Exhibit B_Service on 02182020, #3 Exhibit C_Service on 02202020)(Mehaffey, Heidi)
February 25, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers. Related case(s): no (Bhat, Simi)
February 25, 2020 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Bhat, Simi)
February 24, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Pasco County Board of County Commissioners. (Aschauer, Frederick)
February 21, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Pasco County Board of County Commissioners. Related case(s): No (Aschauer, Frederick)
February 21, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder. scottgrmr@aol.com (SNG)
February 21, 2020 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT of TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER/PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on February 14, 2020 before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott N. Gamertsfelder,Telephone number 813.301.5898. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/13/2020, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2020, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2020. (SNG)
February 20, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Daniel Rametta, Sierra Club. (Hartsell, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Daniel Rametta, Sierra Club. Related case(s): no (Hartsell, Robert)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER directing the parties to submit a proposed order on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction on or before February 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/14/2020. (LJB)
February 14, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell: MOTION HEARING held on 2/14/2020 re 2 Emergency MOTION for preliminary injunction Emergency MOTION for temporary restraining order Emergency EXPARTE MOTION Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Rametta, Sierra Club. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (SKP)
February 13, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in opposition re 8 Notice of hearing on motion Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Pasco County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Aschauer, Frederick)
February 12, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE re 8 Notice of hearing on motion Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Costello, Sara)
February 12, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Poot on behalf of Pasco County Board of County Commissioners (Poot, Nicole)
February 12, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of compliance with Court Order by Daniel Rametta, Sierra Club (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A)(Hartsell, Robert)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER denying Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically #15. No telephonic appearances will be allowed for the February 14, 2020 hearing. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2020. (LJB)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Bhat, Simi) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting Pasco County Board of County Commissioners' Unopposed Motion to Intervene, Motion to Respond Concurrent with the Federal Defendants, Request for Expedited Consideration and Supporting Memorandum of Law #11. Pasco County Board of County Commissioners is granted leave to intervene in this action as a party Defendant. Pasco County Board of County Commissioners may file a motion or pleading responsive to Plaintiffs' Complaint and participate in the hearing scheduled for Friday, February 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2020. (LJB)
February 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Kenneth Stegeby on behalf of United States Army Corps of Engineers (Stegeby, Erik)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Costello on behalf of Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers (Costello, Sara)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to intervene , Motion to Respond Concurrent with the Federal Defendants, Request for Expedited Consideration and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Pasco County Board of County Commissioners. (Aschauer, Frederick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Aschauer, Jr on behalf of Pasco County Board of County Commissioners (Aschauer, Frederick)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Simi Bhat on behalf of All Defendants. Local Counsel: Kenneth Stegeby. Non-Resident Counsel: Simi Bhat. (Bhat, Simi)
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, Supporting Memorandum of Law, and Request for Hearing 2 set for 2/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. (BGS)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/7/2020. (BGS)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/21/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/7/2020. (BGS)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Andrew Kelly, Todd T. Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers. (TDC) Modified on 2/7/2020 (TDC).
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-287-T-36JSS. (SJB)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16448955) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Civil Cover Sheet, #24 Proposed Summons)(Mehaffey, Heidi) Modified on 2/7/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Represented By: Erik Kenneth Stegeby
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd T. Semonite
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew D Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kelly
Represented By: Sara E. Costello
Represented By: Simi Bhat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rametta
Represented By: Heidi Marie Mehaffey
Represented By: Robert N. Hartsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Heidi Marie Mehaffey
Represented By: Robert N. Hartsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Pasco County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Frederick L. Aschauer, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole J. Poot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?