Sebsen Electric LLC, v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 915 et al
Plaintiff: Sebsen Electric LLC, d/b/a Sebsen Electrical Contractors and Sebsen Electric LLC
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 915, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers and International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915
Case Number: 8:2020cv00331
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Zinober, Peter)
April 10, 2020 Filing 19 Answer/ REPLY to #15 Counterclaim by Sebsen Electric LLC. Related document: #15 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915.(Zinober, Peter)
March 26, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sebsen Electric LLC. Related case(s): yes (Peppard, Lara)
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Sebsen Electric LLC. (Peppard, Lara)
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915. Related case(s): yes (Kurnick, Robert)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sebsen Electric LLC by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kurnick, Robert)
March 18, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Robert D. Kurnick and Bartholomew J. Sheard, appearing on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915 (Filing fee $300 receipt number ORL089757.) Related document: #11 Unopposed MOTION for Robert D. Kurnick and Bartholomew J. Sheard to appear pro hac vice . (ARJ)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Robert D. Kurnick and Bartholomew J. Sheard may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/16/2020. (BEE)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #12 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. This cause is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers from this case. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 3/13/2020. (SMB)
March 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Sebsen Electric LLC (Russell, Phillip)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Robert D. Kurnick and Bartholomew J. Sheard to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Wolfmeyer, Nicholas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas R. Wolfmeyer on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915 (Siwica, Richard)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Paul Siwica on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915 (Siwica, Richard)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Zinober on behalf of Sebsen Electric LLC (Zinober, Peter)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara J. Peppard on behalf of Sebsen Electric LLC (Peppard, Lara)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 2/20/2020. (KAC)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915. (BSN)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Sebsen Electric LLC. (Russell, Phillip)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Sebsen Electric LLC. (Russell, Phillip)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-331-T-30AAS. (SJB)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under Labor Management Relations Act to Vacate Arbitration Award against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16466525) filed by Sebsen Electric LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Russell, Phillip) Modified on 2/12/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebsen Electric LLC, v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 915 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 915
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: Nicholas R. Wolfmeyer
Represented By: Robert D. Kurnick
Represented By: Richard Paul Siwica
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Sheard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 915
Represented By: Nicholas R. Wolfmeyer
Represented By: Robert D. Kurnick
Represented By: Richard Paul Siwica
Represented By: Bartholomew J. Sheard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebsen Electric LLC, d/b/a Sebsen Electrical Contractors
Represented By: Phillip Byron Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebsen Electric LLC
Represented By: Phillip Byron Russell
Represented By: Lara J. Peppard
Represented By: Peter W. Zinober
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?