McCann v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS JAMES MCCANN
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv00391
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff filed an amended complaint on April 6, 2020 which supersedes the original complaint. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/6/2020. (CEH)
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Dennis James McCann.(Osborne, Joseph)
April 3, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney C. Lincoln Combs, appearing on behalf of Dennis James McCann (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060605.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for C. Lincoln Combs, Esq., to appear pro hac vice . (JLD)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. C. Lincoln Combs, Esq. may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/27/2020. (BEE)
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Allegations and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Yagoda, Jay) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified on 3/27/2020 (DG).
March 26, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for C. Lincoln Combs, Esq., to appear pro hac vice by Dennis James McCann. (Attachments: #1 LOCAL COUNSEL CONSENT)(Osborne, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yagoda, Jay)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yagoda, Jay)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay Andrew Yagoda on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Yagoda, Jay)
March 18, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 03/05/2020 by Dennis James McCann as to C.R. Bard, Inc. (Osborne, Joseph) Modified on 3/18/2020 (DG).
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 03/05/2020 by Dennis James McCann as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Osborne, Joseph) Modified on 3/18/2020 (DG).
March 6, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Dennis James McCann. (Osborne, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dennis James McCann. Related case(s): yes (Osborne, Joseph)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel C. Lincoln Combs of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (DG)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by DENNIS JAMES MCCANN. (Osborne, Joseph)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by DENNIS JAMES MCCANN. (Osborne, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/20/2020. (BGS)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/20/2020. (BGS)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-391-T-36AAS. (SJB)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16501794) filed by DENNIS JAMES MCCANN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Osborne, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCann v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS JAMES MCCANN
Represented By: Joseph A. Osborne
Represented By: C. Lincoln Combs
Represented By: James Robert Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Andrew Yagoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Andrew Yagoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?