Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kinetic Investment Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Michael Scott Williams, Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Scipio, LLC, El Morro Financial Group, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC and LF42, LLC
Respondent: Branch Banking and Trust Company and Truist
Receiver: Mark A. Kornfeld
Case Number: 8:2020cv00394
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically from order granting motion for appointment of receiver filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion to employ tax and website professionals. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/16/2020. (CCB)
March 16, 2020 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Employ Tax and Website Professionals by Mark A. Kornfeld. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maglich, Jordan)
March 9, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission Of Filing Of Defendant Michael Scott Williams' Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript)(Moot, Stephanie)
March 8, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan D. Maglich on behalf of Mark A. Kornfeld (Maglich, Jordan)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #38 Motion Miscellaneous (Yip). Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (Jung, William)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #37 Motion Miscellaneous Relief (IT). Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (Jung, William)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED ORDER granting #36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (Jung, William)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #35 Motion Miscellaneous Relief. Based upon the SEC's response to Dkt. 35, the SEC states that the Order Granting Receivership did not list Mr. Williams personally as a "receivership defendant." The definition of "Defendant" in the whereas preamble of the Receivership Order is defendant Kinetic Investment Group, LLC. only. And Mr. Williams personally is not listed as a relief defendant. The term "receivership defendants" that can be found later in the Order is defined in paragraph 1 of that Order to be "Defendant" [KIG, LLC] and "Relief Defendants." Accordingly, the SEC appears correct that Mr. Williams personally is not a Receivership Defendant under the Order granting Receivership. The Court appreciates the fairly stark and sudden nature of events unfolding in this case today, and that people are traveling this afternoon and not available for consultation. In the future, both the Williams-related parties and the receiver should kindly discuss all matters in a "meet and confer" before bringing any issue to the Court. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (Jung, William)
March 6, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically from order granting motion for appointment of receiver filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Nestor, Christine)
March 6, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Authorization to Employ Information Technology and Support Personnel by Mark A. Kornfeld. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Maglich, Jordan)
March 6, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Authorization to Employ Yip & Associates as Forensic Accountants by Mark A. Kornfeld. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maglich, Jordan) Modified on 3/9/2020 (BES).
March 6, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Quarles & Brady and Peters, Laplaca, and Fuste by Mark A. Kornfeld. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maglich, Jordan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 6, 2020 Filing 35 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically from order granting motion for appointment of receiver by Michael Scott Williams. (Kehoe, Gregory)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (CCB) (CCB).
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #2 Motion for asset freeze. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (CCB) (AG).
March 6, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 3/6/2020 re #2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically [Emergency] for Asset Freeze and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission; and #3 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (SAO)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #29 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/6/2020. (CCB)
March 5, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams re #29 MOTION to Strike #28 Reply to Response to Motion for Failure to Seek Leave of Court Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(c) filed by Scipio, LLC, LF42, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Michael Scott Williams, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, KIH, Inc., El Morro Financial Group, LLC (Kehoe, Gregory)
March 5, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike #28 Reply to Response to Motion for Failure to Seek Leave of Court Pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(c) by All Defendants. (Kehoe, Gregory)
March 5, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Receiver, #2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically [Emergency] for Asset Freeze and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Composite, #2 Exhibit 2 Excerpt of Guar Testimonty, #3 Exhibit 3 Acct Opening Docs, #4 Exhibit 4 Excerpts of Pufahl Testimony, #5 Exhibit 5 Excerpts of Locke Testimony)(Nestor, Christine)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the Courthouse for Hearing. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/5/2020. (SAO)
March 5, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Brinng Electronic Equipment Into the Courthouse For Hearing by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Moot, Stephanie)
March 4, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically [Emergency] for Asset Freeze and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration)(Kehoe, Gregory)
February 28, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Steven M. Malina (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060226.) Related document: #22 Unopposed MOTION for Steven M. Malina to appear pro hac vice . (ARC)
February 27, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by Securities and Exchange Commission of Re-filing Exhibit 6 in Support of Plaintiff's Emergency Motion and Memorandum of Law for Asset for Asset Freeze and Other Relief (DE 2) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6)(Nestor, Christine)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion for Steven M. Malina to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 2/26/2020. (CKR)
February 26, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Steven M. Malina to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Written Designation and Consent to Act, #2 Exhibit B - Special Admission Attorney Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing)(Kehoe, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
February 26, 2020 Filing 21 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Michael Scott Williams. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Scipio, LLC. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to LF42, LLC. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Kinetic Investment Group, LLC. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Kinetic Funds I, LLC. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to KIH, Inc.. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to KCL Services, LLC. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 26, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/25/20 by Securities and Exchange Commission as to El Morro Financial Group, LLC. (Moot, Stephanie)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle Susan Kemp on behalf of El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams (Kemp, Danielle)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Picone on behalf of El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams (Picone, Joseph)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Kehoe on behalf of El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams (Kehoe, Gregory)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED HEARING on #2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically [Emergency] for Asset Freeze and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 EMERGENCY MOTION to Appoint Receiver. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER re #6 Order on briefing schedule and hearing. Upon the parties' request, the deadline for filing responses to the motions at dockets #2 and #3 is 5:00 p.m. Wednesday, March 4, 2020. The hearing on the motions is continued to Friday, March 6, 2020. Separate notice setting the precise time will follow. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/21/2020. (CCB)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams. (TDC)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of HEARING on #2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically [Emergency] for Asset Freeze and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Emergency MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Appointment of Receiver and Memorandum of Law in Support . Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for expedited briefing and hearing in accord with attached order. Separate notice to follow. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/21/2020. (CCB)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-394-T-02SPF. (SJB)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Expedited Briefing and for Hearing on Emergency Motions by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moot, Stephanie)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Appointment of Receiver and Memorandum of Law in Support by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moot, Stephanie) Modified event and text on 2/24/2020 (JNB).
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically [Emergency] for Asset Freeze and Other Relief and Memorandum of Law in Support by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1, Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1, Part 3, #4 Exhibit 2, Part 1, #5 Exhibit 2, Part 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, Part 1, #9 Exhibit 5, Part 2, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, Part 1, #39 Exhibit 34, Part 2, #40 Exhibit 34, Part 3, #41 Exhibit 34, Part 4, #42 Exhibit 35, #43 Exhibit 36, #44 Exhibit 38, #45 Exhibit 39, #46 Exhibit 40, #47 Exhibit 41, #48 Exhibit 42, #49 Exhibit 43, #50 Exhibit 44, Part 1, #51 Exhibit 44, Part 2, #52 Exhibit 44, Part 3, #53 Exhibit 45, #54 Exhibit 46, #55 Exhibit 47, #56 Exhibit 48, #57 Exhibit 49, #58 Exhibit 50, #59 Exhibit 51, #60 Exhibit 52, #61 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #62 Text of Proposed Order)(Moot, Stephanie)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Other Relief and Demand for Jury Trial against El Morro Financial Group, LLC, KCL Services, LLC, KIH, Inc., Kinetic Funds I, LLC, Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, LF42, LLC, Scipio, LLC, Michael Scott Williams with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons As to Kinetic Investment Group, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons As to Michael Scott Williams, #4 Proposed Summons As to Kinetic Funds I, LLC, #5 Proposed Summons As to KCL Services, LLC, #6 Proposed Summons As to Scipio, LLC, #7 Proposed Summons As to LF42, LLC, #8 Proposed Summons As to El Morro Financial Group, LLC, #9 Proposed Summons As to KIH, Inc.)(Moot, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Kinetic Investment Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCL Services, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIH, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott Williams
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinetic Funds I, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scipio, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Morro Financial Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinetic Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LF42, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Malina
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Joseph H. Picone
Represented By: Danielle Susan Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Stephanie Nicole Moot
Represented By: John T. Houchin
Represented By: Barbara Viniegra
Represented By: Christine Nestor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Truist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Mark A. Kornfeld
Represented By: Jordan D. Maglich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?