United States of America v. Louisville et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tommy L. Louisville and Tommy L. Louisville, M.D., P.A.
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2020cv00559
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by United States of America re #18 Order, #16 Case management and scheduling order, 17 Order that copies of ECF 16-18 were mailed to Tommy L. Louisville. (Desmond, Conor)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/5/2020. (SKP)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. # 16), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/5/2020. (SKP)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Bench Trial set for the May 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/8/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/5/2020. (SKP)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Desmond, Conor)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part the joint motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint. (Doc. #13). Defendants' response to the complaint is now due May 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/21/2020. (DMD)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): no (Desmond, Conor)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by May 4, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/31/2020. (DMD)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service by United States of America (Desmond, Conor)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/27/2020. (TWL)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/27/2020. (TWL)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for reconsideration of tracking order. (Doc. #6). The Clerk is directed to redesignate this case as track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/27/2020. (DMD)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/17/2020. (TWL)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Tommy L. Louisville, Tommy L. Louisville, M.D., P.A. (TDC)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-559-T-33CPT. (SJB)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by United States of America. (Desmond, Conor)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tommy L. Louisville, Tommy L. Louisville, M.D., P.A. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Desmond, Conor) Modified on 3/10/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Louisville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy L. Louisville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy L. Louisville, M.D., P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Conor P. Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?