CNH Finance Fund I, L.P. v. Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership et al
Appellant: CNH Finance Fund I, L.P.
Appellee: Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership, CPIF Lending, LLC, Jeffrey W. Warren, Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership, Valley National Bank, The Jennis Law Firm and US Lifestyles, LLC
In Re: Westport Holdings Tampa Limited Partnership Case No. 8:16-bk-8167MGW; Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership 8:16-bk-8168MGW; Jointly Administered under Case No. 8:16-bk-8167MGW
Case Number: 8:2020cv00625
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 04/14/2020. (LD)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/14/2020. (GMD)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by CNH Finance Fund I, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 2. Notice of Appeal, #2 3. Order on Appeal #1633, #3 4. Order on Appeal #1644, #4 5. Order on Appeal #1645 pt. 1, #5 6. Order on Appeal #1645 pt. 2, #6 7. Order on Appeal #1410, #7 8. Order on Appeal #1654, #8 9. Public Docket)(JN)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice by Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership, Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership. (Alpert, Adam)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Wayne Warren on behalf of Jeffrey W. Warren (Warren, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Lawton Alpert on behalf of Jeffrey W. Warren (Alpert, Adam)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Labbee on behalf of Jeffrey W. Warren (Labbee, Laura)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER concerning Jury Trials and Other Proceedings in re: Coronavirus Public Emergency. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/19/2020. (SMS)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by CNH Finance Fund I, L.P. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:16-bk-08167-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 02/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CNH Finance Fund I, L.P. v. Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: CNH Finance Fund I, L.P.
Represented By: Michael R. Lastowski
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Scott Alan Stichter
Represented By: Matthew Blake Hale
Represented By: Adam Lawton Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CPIF Lending, LLC
Represented By: Mark A. Salzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jeffrey W. Warren
Represented By: Adam Lawton Alpert
Represented By: Laura Labbee
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Westport Holdings Tampa, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Scott Alan Stichter
Represented By: Matthew Blake Hale
Represented By: Adam Lawton Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Valley National Bank
Represented By: Chantal Pillay
Represented By: Edmund S. Whitson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The Jennis Law Firm
Represented By: David Samuel Jennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Lifestyles, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Westport Holdings Tampa Limited Partnership Case No. 8:16-bk-8167MGW; Westport Holdings Tampa II, Limited Partnership 8:16-bk-8168MGW; Jointly Administered under Case No. 8:16-bk-8167MGW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?