Martino v. Campbell
Plaintiff: Lesa Maria Martino
Defendant: Pamela Campbell
Case Number: 8:2020cv00694
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendant Pamela Campbell's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice (Doc. #6) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions or deadlines and thereafter CLOSE THIS CASE.Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/8/2020. (SGM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION and Response to Defendant, re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) with Prejudice and Memorandum of Law by Lesa Maria Martino (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CRH)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Lesa Martino has attempted to file certain documents pertinent to this case by sending them directly to the judge assigned to this matter. The Court takes this opportunity to remind Plaintiff of Local Rule 3.01(f), which provides that all applications to the Court, including all pleadings and papers, must be filed with the Clerk of Court and not with the judge. In this instance, the Court has filed the pleading that Plaintiff incorrectly submitted as a courtesy to her. To properly submit future filings, the Court directs Plaintiff to the Court's website, specifically https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/coronavirus-and-email-filing-information, which explains how litigants may file pleadings during this time of office restrictions. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/24/2020. (SGM)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1) with Prejudice and Memorandum of Law filed by Lesa Maria Martino. (AG)
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #1 with Prejudice and Memorandum of Law by Pamela Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Quinlan, Brittany)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Koptis Quinlan on behalf of Pamela Campbell. (Quinlan, Brittany)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff shall review and comply with the provisions of this Order, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida, and any applicable statutes and regulations. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/26/2020. (TWL)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/26/2020. (TWL)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Pamela Campbell. (MCB)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela Campbell with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA060546 filed by Lesa Maria Martino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martino v. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa Maria Martino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Campbell
Represented By: Brittany Koptis Quinlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?