Baldwin v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Misty Baldwin
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv00960
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set on the June 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Conduct mediation hearing by 9/16/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/22/2020. (SKP)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bank of America Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway for Bank of America Corporation; Corporate Parent Metlife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine) Modified text on 5/21/2020 (LNR).
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #13 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have up to and including June 16, 2020 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2020. (MWC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bank of America Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 5/7/2020 by Misty Baldwin as to Bank of America Corporation. (Swartwood, Gregory)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Misty Baldwin (Swartwood, Gregory)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Misty Baldwin. (Swartwood, Gregory)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Misty Baldwin. Related case(s): no (Swartwood, Gregory)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Related case(s): NO (Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeannine Cline Jacobson on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Jacobson, Jeannine)
May 5, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 05/05/2020 by Misty Baldwin as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Swartwood, Gregory)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/30/2020. (MR)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/30/2020. (MR)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bank of America Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (MCB)
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-960-T-35AEP. (SJB)
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16747858) filed by Misty Baldwin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons MetLife, #4 Proposed Summons BOA)(Swartwood, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Baldwin
Represented By: Gregory D. Swartwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?