Sellers v. HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc.
Plaintiff: Candace Sellers
Defendant: HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00988
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/2/2021; Dispositive motions due by 5/3/2021; Pretrial Conference set for WEDNESDAY, NOVEMBER 10, 2021, at 9:45 A.M. in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr.; Jury Trial set on the DECEMBER 2021 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/22/2020. (SMB)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Jaensch, Tracey)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Johnson, Viktoryia)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service by Candace Sellers re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice, #8 Notice of pendency of related cases . (Fraley, Ronald)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc.(Jaensch, Tracey) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (BSN).
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Candace Sellers. Related case(s): no (Fraley, Ronald)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc. (BSN)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Candace Sellers re 3 Notice to counsel of Local Rule Civil Cover Sheet (Fraley, Ronald)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Candace Sellers. (Fraley, Ronald)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 4/30/2020. (KAC)
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Ronald W. Fraley of Local Rule 1.05(e), which states - The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. File a completed Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-988-T-30SPF. (SJB)
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16756617) filed by Candace Sellers.(Fraley, Ronald) Modified on 4/29/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Sellers
Represented By: Ronald W. Fraley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Health Services of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?