Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2012- LC5, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2012-LC5 and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 8:2020cv01022
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/5/2020. (CCB)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/5/2020. (CCB)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC (Arnot, Mark)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/5/2020. (SAO)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Bank National Association. (TDC) Modified on 5/5/2020 (AG).
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1022-T-02AEP. (SJB)
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Beechwood Development, LLC, Other Affiliate Ray Foundation, Inc, Other Affiliate Hanson Investment Holdings, LLC for Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC. (Arnot, Mark) Modified on 5/4/2020 (TDC).
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause by Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas D. Arnot in Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit 1 to Arnot Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting TRO, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Arnot, Mark)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Bank with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16768260) filed by Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Arnot, Mark) Modified on 5/4/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Wells Fargo Commercial Mortgage Trust 2012- LC5, Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2012-LC5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Lakeland Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Mark Arnot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?