Alsop, et al v. Desantis
Plaintiff: Mr Craig A. Huffman
Case Number: 8:2020cv01052
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Galen Alsop, Wendy Alsop, Andrew Greenstein Trust, Florida Beach Rentals, LLC, Florida Real Estate Rentals, LLC, Paul Gassner, Lance Gruner, HeyVacay, Inc., Joan Hickman, Jonathan Howard, Eugene King, MICHAEL MILLER, Michael McGrath, John McGuire, Christina Modie, Richard Modie, Our Property Rentals, LLC, Melissa Palmeri, Robert Palmeri, Mark Peery, Christina Sanchez Miller, The Great Escape Parkside, LLC, The Sweet Escape 1, LLC, Adam Wilson, Shawn Wilson, Tracy Wilson, Eric Yonkee. (Lirot, Luke)
June 26, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ronald Desantis. (Uthmeier, James)
June 19, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ronald Desantis. (Uthmeier, James)
June 5, 2020 Filing 27 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Lirot, Luke)
June 5, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Galen Alsop, Wendy Alsop, Florida Beach Rentals, LLC, Paul Gassner, MICHAEL MILLER, Michael McGrath, Mark Peery of Filing Amended Declarations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Signed Declarations)(Lirot, Luke)
June 5, 2020 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint filed by Mark Peery, Paul Gassner, Florida Real Estate Rentals, LLC, Galen Alsop, Michael McGrath, Wendy Alsop, #1 Complaint filed by Galen Alsop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exec. Order 20-80, #2 Exhibit Executive Order 20-82, #3 Exhibit Executive Order 20-87, #4 Exhibit Executive Order 20-103, #5 Exhibit Executive Order 20-112, #6 Exhibit Executive Order 20-123)(Lirot, Luke)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23--motion to amend the complaint; amended complaint due 6/5/2020; denying as moot #8--motion for leave to file amicus curiae brief; denying as moot #9--motion to intervene; denying as moot #11--motion for preliminary injunction; denying as moot #16--motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/1/2020. (BK)
May 28, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #10 Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint and Exhibits)(Lirot, Luke)
May 28, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene filed by Ronald Desantis. (Uthmeier, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Elliott Pratt on behalf of Ronald Desantis (Pratt, Joshua)
May 27, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by James William Uthmeier on behalf of Ronald Desantis (Uthmeier, James)
May 27, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 5-18-20 by Mark Peery, Wendy Alsop, Michael McGrath, Galen Alsop, Florida Beach Rentals, LLC, Paul Gassner as to All Plaintiffs. (Huffman, Craig)
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of service by Mark Peery, Wendy Alsop, Michael McGrath, Galen Alsop, Florida Beach Rentals, LLC, Paul Gassner as to All Plaintiffs. (Huffman, Craig) Modified on 5/27/2020 (DG). Item was correctly filed by counsel as #17. Clerk's Office mistakenly requested item to be refiled using another docketing code. Modified on 5/27/2020 (DG).
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of service by Galen Alsop, Wendy Alsop, Florida Beach Rentals, LLC, Florida Real Estate Rentals, LLC, Paul Gassner re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Huffman, Craig) COUNSEL TO REFILE ITEM USING CORRECT DOCKETING CODE [SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED] Modified on 5/26/2020 (DG).
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declarations of Plaintiffs)(Huffman, Craig)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #9--unopposed motion by MICHAEL MILLER to intervene -- and re #11--motion by MICHAEL MILLER for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/21/2020. (BK)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Galen Alsop, Wendy Alsop, Florida Beach Rentals, LLC, Paul Gassner, Michael McGrath, Mark Peery (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Desantis, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service-Moody)(Huffman, Craig)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by MICHAEL MILLER. (Lirot, Luke)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by MICHAEL MILLER of Filing Corrected Declarations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Intervenor Declarations)(Lirot, Luke) Modified on 5/15/2020 (DG).
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by MICHAEL MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lirot, Luke)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Galen Alsop.(Huffman, Craig)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by MICHAEL MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Lirot, Luke)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by AMI Locals, LLC, Florida Gulf Coast Vacation Homes, LLC, Lawrence Vargas. (Thomas, Aaron)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6--motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/8/2020. (GSO)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Affidavits and Accompanying Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Alsop Affidavit, #2 Affidavit VonFeldt, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Huffman, Craig)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1--complaint's request for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/8/2020. (BK)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Ronald Desantis. (DG)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Galen Alsop. (Huffman, Craig)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1052-T-23SPF. (SJB)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY ACTION AND FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER against Defendant (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-16783172) filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huffman, Craig) Modified on 5/7/2020 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alsop, et al v. Desantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Craig A. Huffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?