Davis v. DeSantis et al
Plaintiff: Kurt E. Davis
Defendant: Hillsborough County and Ron DeSantis
Case Number: 8:2020cv01067
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ron DeSantis. Related case(s): yes (Ernst, Colleen)
June 30, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Ron DeSantis. (Ernst, Colleen)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion to conduct case management conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 6/30/2020. (BEE)
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Permitting Case Management Report meeting via telephone by Kurt E. Davis. (Davis, Kurt)
June 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ron DeSantis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ernst, Colleen)
June 23, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Kurt E. Davis. (Davis, Kurt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kurt E. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Davis, Kurt)
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Ron DeSantis. (Ernst, Colleen)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Kurt E. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Response, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Response)(Davis, Kurt)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Elliott Pratt on behalf of Ron DeSantis (Pratt, Joshua)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Colleen M. Ernst on behalf of Ron DeSantis (Ernst, Colleen)
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #7 Interim MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hillsborough County. (Brazel, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER denying #3 Motion for Default Judgment and for Clerk's Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 5/19/2020. (BEE)
May 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Hillsborough County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Brazel, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Hillsborough County. Related case(s): n (Brazel, Robert)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kurt E. Davis. (Davis, Kurt)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kurt E. Davis. Related case(s): No. (Davis, Kurt) Modified on 5/14/2020 (DG).
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Hillsborough County. (Brazel, Robert)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Interim MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kurt E. Davis. (Davis, Kurt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Hillsborough County. (Brazel, Robert)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/11/2020. (BGS)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/11/2020. (BGS)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Default Judgment against Hillsborough County, MOTION for Clerk's Default against Hillsborough County by Kurt E. Davis. (Originally filed in state court on 5/4/2020). (TDC) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified text on 5/8/2020 (AG).
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1067-T-36AAS. (SJB)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL At the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, in and for Hillsborough County, FL, case number 20-CA-002928 filed in State Court on 3/30/20. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16789192 filed by Hillsborough County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Form JS-44, #6 State Court COMPLAINT Original Complaint, #7 State Court COMPLAINT Amended Complaint, #8 State Court Pending Motions Motion for Default, #9 State Court Docket Sheet, #10 State Court Other Documents Part 1, #11 State Court Other Documents Part 2)(Brazel, Robert) Modified on 5/8/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. DeSantis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Represented By: Robert E. Brazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron DeSantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt E. Davis
Represented By: Kurt E. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?