RK Solutions, LLC et al v. The Fulfillment Lab, Inc.
Plaintiff: RK Solutions, LLC, Compound Solutions, Inc. and Axcess Global Sciences, LLC
Defendant: The Fulfillment Lab, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01072
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Interested persons order by Axcess Global Sciences, LLC, Compound Solutions, Inc., RK Solutions, LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Axcess Global Sciences, LLC, Compound Solutions, Inc., RK Solutions, LLC. Related case(s): no (Wernow, Howard)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/27/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/13/2020. (KAC)
May 13, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ryan E. Hatch, appearing on behalf of Axcess Global Sciences, LLC, Compound Solutions, Inc., RK Solutions, LLC. (Filing fee $150 receipt number 113A-16795697.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Ryan E. Hatch to appear pro hac vice. (KE)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The parties shall utilize the ATTACHED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT FORM. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/26/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/12/2020. (KAC)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan E. Hatch. Within 14 days hereof, counsel shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/12/2020. (AHA)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Ryan E. Hatch to appear pro hac vice by Axcess Global Sciences, LLC, Compound Solutions, Inc., RK Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KE) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to The Fulfillment Lab, Inc. (MCB)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MCB)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Ryan E. Hatch of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1072-T-35CPT. (SJB)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Axcess Global Sciences, LLC, Compound Solutions, Inc., RK Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Axcess Global, LLC for Axcess Global Sciences, LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (JNB).
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Fulfillment Lab, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16791580) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 6613356, #2 Exhibit B - GOBHB Cert., #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RK Solutions, LLC et al v. The Fulfillment Lab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Fulfillment Lab, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RK Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compound Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axcess Global Sciences, LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Ryan E. Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?