Escudero v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Juan Escudero
Defendant: United States of Ameica and United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv01128
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: James D Whittemore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:16-cr-505-T-27AAS filed by Juan Escudero. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing United States of America to respond to #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:16-cr-505-T-27AAS. The Government shall file its response within 60 days from the date Petitioner files his amended 2255 motion, or July 1, 2020, whichever is the earlier. Signed by Judge James D. Whittemore on 5/18/2020. (AKA)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (CAB)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:16-cr-505-T-27AAS filed by Juan Escudero. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(CRH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Escudero v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of Ameica
Represented By: Taylor G. Stout
Represented By: Christopher Francis Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Taylor G. Stout
Represented By: Christopher Francis Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?