Priority Business Services, Inc. et al v. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Geneva Staffing, Inc., Priority Business Services, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. and Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Packard Claims Administration, Inc. and Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Not Classified By Court: Robert Michael Daisley
Case Number: 8:2020cv01141
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re mediation; see order for details concerning appearance at mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/17/2020. (GSO)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER appointing Robert M. Daisley as mediator; designating Vincent Gannuscio as lead counsel; setting 10/7/2020 as the mediation deadline; directing counsel to file a notice within seven days giving the date and time of mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/17/2020. (GSO)
July 16, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by David Nigel Miller on behalf of South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Miller, David)
July 14, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of David N. Miller's Appearance by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Gollin, Lynn) COUNSEL, DAVID N. MILLER MUST REFILE THIS DOCUMENT USING HIS OWN PERSONAL ECF LOGIN/PASSWORD. Modified on 7/14/2020 (DG).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 8/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the September 2021 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/13/2020. (GSO)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying as moot #30--stipulation; directing the clerk to REMOVE Rebecca Weinreich and Jordon Harriman as counsel for Packard Claims Administration, Inc. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/6/2020. (BK)
June 30, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Priority Business Services, Inc. (Gannuscio, Vincent) Modified on 7/1/2020 (DG).
June 30, 2020 Filing 42 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Gannuscio, Vincent)
June 25, 2020 Filing 41 Written designation and consent to act by William Albert McBride on behalf of Priority Business Services, Inc.. Local Counsel: William A. McBride. Non-Resident Counsel: Nicholas P. Roxborough. (McBride, William)
June 25, 2020 Filing 40 Written designation and consent to act by William Albert McBride on behalf of Priority Business Services, Inc.. Local Counsel: William A. McBride. Non-Resident Counsel: Donna M. Leung. (McBride, William)
June 24, 2020 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-16980352 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Donna M. Leung. (Gannuscio, Vincent)
June 24, 2020 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-16980342 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas P. Roxborough. (Gannuscio, Vincent)
June 18, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lion Insurance Company for South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Gollin, Lynn) Modified on 6/18/2020 (DG).
June 12, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #27 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Packard Claims Administration, Inc. Related case(s): no. (DiFiore, Dorothy) Modified on 6/15/2020 (DG).
June 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE by Priority Business Services, Inc. of Related Actions (Gannuscio, Vincent) COUNSEL TO REFILE ITEM USING CORRECT DOCKETING CODE [NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF RELATED CASES] Modified on 6/12/2020 (DG).
June 12, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #27 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. Related case(s): no (Gollin, Lynn) Modified on 6/12/2020 (DG).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER granting unopposed motions to appear pro hac vice (docs. 33, 34). Attorneys Donna Leung and Nicholas Roxborough may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Attorney William McBride designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/5/2020. (ACS)
June 5, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Nicholas P. Roxborough to appear pro hac vice by Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Priority Business Services, Inc., Geneva Staffing, Inc. Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. (McBride, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG). Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG).
June 5, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Donna M. Leung to appear pro hac vice by Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Priority Business Services, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc., Geneva Staffing, Inc. (McBride, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG). Modified on 6/8/2020 (DG).
June 5, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Maynard Gollin on behalf of South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. (Gollin, Lynn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Packard Claims Administration, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., A Florida Corporation, Other Affiliate John A. Porecca, Other Affiliate Deborah A. Porecca, Other Affiliate Lion Insurance Company for Packard Claims Administration, Inc... (DiFiore, Dorothy)
June 4, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (DiFiore, Dorothy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by William Albert McBride on behalf of Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Geneva Staffing, Inc., Priority Business Services, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. (McBride, William)
June 2, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Koenig on behalf of Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Geneva Staffing, Inc., Priority Business Services, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. (Koenig, Eric)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/27/2020. (GSO)
May 27, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
May 26, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to affirmative defenses by Priority Business Services, Inc. (Gannuscio, Vincent) Modified on 5/27/2020 (DG).
May 26, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to affirmative defenses by Priority Business Services, Inc. (Gannuscio, Vincent) Modified on 5/27/2020 (DG).
May 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE to counsel Jordon Edward Harriman of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE to counsel Rebecca R. Weinreich of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE to counsel Tatiana Dupuy of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE to counsel Eric Richard Deitz of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE to counsel Nicholas P. Roxborough of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE to counsel Donna Marie Leung of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 17 TRANSFER IN from the District of Central California. Case assigned to District Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New Case Number: 8:20-cv-1141-T-23SPF. (AG)
May 20, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:20-cv-00642. File received electronically
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Motion to Transfer by Judge James V. Selna: For the following reasons, the Court GRANTS the motion. (See order for details.) MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (es) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #9 filed by Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. (Deitz, Eric) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 Opposition in Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #9 filed by Plaintiff Priority Business Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Cox in support of Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue)(Leung, Donna) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division #9 filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Harriman, Jordon) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Priority Business Services, Inc.; Workforce Outsourcing, Inc.; Geneva Staffing, Inc.; Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC; SouthEast Personnel Leasing, Inc.; Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Leung, Donna) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 6/15/2020. (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division filed by Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/18/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Tatiana Dupuy, #3 Proposed Order) (Dupuy, Tatiana) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant South East Personnel Leasing, Inc..(Attorney Tatiana Dupuy added to party South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dupuy, Tatiana) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc..(Harriman, Jordon) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiffs Priority Business Services, Inc., Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Geneva Staffing, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc., upon Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc. served on 3/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cogency Global, Inc., Registered Agent, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 4/2/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Packard Claims Administration, Inc., South East Personnel Leasing, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Priority Business Services, Inc., Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC, Geneva Staffing, Inc., Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. (filed in state court 2/28/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc., identifying John A. Porecca, and Deborah A. Porecca. (Harriman, Jordon) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Harriman, Jordon) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01135232-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-25946554 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Packard Claims Administration, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint) (Attorney Jordon Edward Harriman added to party Packard Claims Administration, Inc.(pty:dft))(Harriman, Jordon) [Transferred from cacd on 5/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Priority Business Services, Inc. et al v. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Richard Deitz
Represented By: Tatiana Dupuy
Represented By: David Nigel Miller
Represented By: Lynn Maynard Gollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packard Claims Administration, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca R Weinreich
Represented By: Jordon Edward Harriman
Represented By: Dorothy Venable DiFiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P. Roxborough
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Represented By: Vincent S. Gannuscio
Represented By: William Albert McBride
Represented By: Eric S. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priority Business Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P. Roxborough
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Represented By: Vincent S. Gannuscio
Represented By: William Albert McBride
Represented By: Eric S. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Workforce Outsourcing, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas P. Roxborough
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Represented By: Vincent S. Gannuscio
Represented By: William Albert McBride
Represented By: Eric S. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epiphany Staffing Group, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas P. Roxborough
Represented By: Donna Marie Leung
Represented By: Vincent S. Gannuscio
Represented By: William Albert McBride
Represented By: Eric S. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert Michael Daisley
Represented By: Robert Michael Daisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?