Suncoast Waterkeeper et al v. Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC
Plaintiff: Suncoast Waterkeeper, Our Children's Earth Foundation and Tampa Bay Waterkeeper
Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01160
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of compliance re 9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Our Children's Earth Foundation, Suncoast Waterkeeper, Tampa Bay Waterkeeper (Chermak, Douglas)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Douglas Chermak may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Attorney Justin Bloom designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/16/2020. (REE)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Douglas Chermak to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16940463 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bloom, Justin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Our Children's Earth Foundation, Suncoast Waterkeeper, Tampa Bay Waterkeeper. (Bloom, Justin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Our Children's Earth Foundation, Suncoast Waterkeeper, Tampa Bay Waterkeeper. Related case(s): no (Bloom, Justin)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/22/2020. (KAC)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/22/2020. (KAC)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC. (TDC)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1160-T-35AEP. (SJB)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief and civil penalties against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16826864) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Bloom, Justin) Modified on 5/20/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suncoast Waterkeeper et al v. Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suncoast Waterkeeper
Represented By: Justin Bloom
Represented By: Douglas Chermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Our Children's Earth Foundation
Represented By: Justin Bloom
Represented By: Douglas Chermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tampa Bay Waterkeeper
Represented By: Justin Bloom
Represented By: Douglas Chermak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trademark Metals Recycling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?