Alexis, et al v. Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Rosales and Fabiola Alexis
Defendant: Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, Maria Blanchard and Cognizant Business Services Corporation
Case Number: 8:2020cv01170
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #20--mediation report; dismissing the action; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 7/8/2020. (BK)
July 2, 2020 Filing 20 MEDIATION report Hearing held on June 24, 2020. Hearing outcome: Settled. (Munoz, Shane) Modified on 7/2/2020 (DG).
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18--motion for an extension of time; extending through 7/22/2020 the time within which Cognizant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/11/2020. (BK)
June 10, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Complaint (6-9-2020) Pending Private Mediation by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Notice of designation of track per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/29/2020. (GSO)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hopkinson, Kathryn)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11--motion to amend the complaint to substitute Cognizant Technology Solutions US Corporation for Cognizant Business Services Corporation; amended complaint due 5/29/2020; directing the clerk to AMEND the case caption in accord with the amended complaint; granting #9--motion for an extension of time; extending through 6/22/2020 the time within which the defendants must respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/26/2020. (BK)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party Defendant Cognizant by All Plaintiffs. (Hopkinson, Kathryn)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Sari M. Alamuddin; granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anna K. Perocchi; granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Special Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew A. Russell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/21/2020. (AHA)
May 21, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal or otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Reynolds, Anthony Ray)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew A. Russell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836446 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Anna K. Perocchi to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836412 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Sari M. Alamuddin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16836376 for $150 by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Sari M. Alamuddin of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Matthew A. Russell of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Anna K. Perocchi of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1170-T-23CPT. (SJB)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant Cognizant Business Services Corporation At the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number 20-CA-003459 filed in State Court on 04/20/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16833424 filed by Cognizant Business Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Docket Sheet Exhibit 1A, #3 State Court Other Documents Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reynolds, Anthony Ray) Modified on 5/21/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexis, et al v. Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognizant Technology Solutions U.S. Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Ray Espino Reynolds
Represented By: Matthew A. Russell
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Anna K. Perocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Blanchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Ray Espino Reynolds
Represented By: Matthew A. Russell
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Anna K. Perocchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rosales
Represented By: Kathryn Comly Hopkinson
Represented By: James Moten Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabiola Alexis
Represented By: Kathryn Comly Hopkinson
Represented By: James Moten Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?