Ellenwood v. World Triathlon Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Mikaela Ellenwood
Defendant: Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation and Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2020cv01182
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys John F. Edgar and Michael R. Owens may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Nathan C. Zipperian designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/23/2020. (REE)
June 23, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Michael R. Owens to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16972249 for $150 by Mikaela Ellenwood. (Zipperian, Nathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for John F. Edgar to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16972231 for $150 by Mikaela Ellenwood. (Zipperian, Nathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Cannella on behalf of World Triathlon Corporation (Cannella, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice by Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated, Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation. (Kouffman, Dominic)
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated, Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation. Related case(s): No (Kouffman, Dominic)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mikaela Ellenwood. Related case(s): No (Zipperian, Nathan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mikaela Ellenwood. (Zipperian, Nathan)
June 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominic Kouffman on behalf of Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated, Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation (Kouffman, Dominic)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys James C. Shah and Michael P. Ols may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Nathan C. Zipperian designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/9/2020. (REE)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Michael P. Ols to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16908906 for $150 by Mikaela Ellenwood. (Zipperian, Nathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for James C. Shah to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-16908863 for $150 by Mikaela Ellenwood. (Zipperian, Nathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 6/2/2020. (SRC)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER of service returned executed on 05/28/2020 by Mikaela Ellenwood as to Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated, Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation. (Zipperian, Nathan)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated, Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation. (TDC)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Michael R. Owens of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel John F. Edgar of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TDC)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1182-T-60AEP. (SJB)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated, Competitor Group, Inc., World Triathlon Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16841067) filed by Mikaela Ellenwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - World Trade Corporation, #3 Proposed Summons - Competitor Group Holdings Incorporated, #4 Proposed Summons - Competitor Group, Inc,)(Zipperian, Nathan) Modified on 5/22/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellenwood v. World Triathlon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitor Group, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic Kouffman
Represented By: David E. Cannella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Triathlon Corporation
Represented By: Dominic Kouffman
Represented By: David E. Cannella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Competitor Group Holdings, Incorporated
Represented By: Dominic Kouffman
Represented By: David E. Cannella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikaela Ellenwood
Represented By: Michael R. Owens
Represented By: John F. Edgar
Represented By: Nathan Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?