Hooker v. Wilkie et al
Plaintiff: Carlton E. Hooker, Jr.
Defendant: Robert Wilkie and William Barr
Case Number: 8:2020cv01248
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE re 16 Order on Motion to Stay filed by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (JLD)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #12 Notice (Other) filed by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CRH)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Stay deadlines for responses and case management until the Court rules on the pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/21/2020. (CCB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Response Deadlines and Case Management Deadlines by All Defendants. (Leuthauser, Stephanie)
July 13, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (LNR)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8) is due July 20, 2020 according to the rules. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/13/2020. (Jung, William)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by William Barr, Robert Wilkie re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Leuthauser, Stephanie)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(MCB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by William Barr, Robert Wilkie. (Leuthauser, Stephanie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by William Barr, Robert Wilkie. Related case(s): Yes (Leuthauser, Stephanie)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Leuthauser, Stephanie)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (JLD)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. Related case(s): yes (JLD)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/9/2020. (SAO)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #3 Plaintiff's Request for Access to CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 6/4/2020. (AHA)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for access to CM/ECF by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (MCB)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to William Barr and Robert Wilkie.(MCB)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA61033) filed by Carlton E. Hooker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooker v. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlton E. Hooker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Represented By: Stephanie Smith Leuthauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Stephanie Smith Leuthauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?