Longo et al v. Campus Advantage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raina Pomeroy, Joseph Longo and Lois Spatz
Defendant: Campus Advantage Inc and Campus Advantage, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01363
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Allen, Amanda)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Campus Advantage, Inc. (Levine, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joseph Longo, Raina Pomeroy, Lois Spatz. Related case(s): no (Allen, Amanda)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice by Joseph Longo, Raina Pomeroy, Lois Spatz. (Allen, Amanda)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement. Defendant's Corrected Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Campus Advantage, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Campus Advantage, Inc. for Campus Advantage, Inc. (Levine, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #11 Notice (Other); Defendant's Corrected Notice of Pendency per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Campus Advantage, Inc. Related case(s): no (Levine, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice by Campus Advantage, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Campus Advantage, Inc. for Campus Advantage, Inc. (Levine, Justin)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Campus Advantage, Inc. re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice; Notice of Pendency of other cases. (Levine, Justin)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/9/2020. (SAO)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Defendant's Appearance by S. Jonathan Vine on behalf of Campus Advantage, Inc. (Vine, S.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 ***TERMINATED; duplicate, other counsel to file NOA.*** NOTICE of Defendant's Appearance by Justin Levine on behalf of Campus Advantage, Inc. (Levine, Justin) Modified text on 7/1/2020 (LNR).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to complaint. Response due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/29/2020. (CCB)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to complaint by Campus Advantage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Levine, Justin)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Defendant's Appearance by Justin Levine on behalf of Campus Advantage, Inc. (Levine, Justin)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 6/16/2020 by Joseph Longo, Raina Pomeroy, Lois Spatz as to Campus Advantage, Inc. (Allen, Amanda)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Campus Advantage, Inc.(MCB)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:20-cv-1363-T-02AEP. (LRB)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against Campus Advantage Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16931652) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Allen, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longo et al v. Campus Advantage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raina Pomeroy
Represented By: Amanda J. Allen
Represented By: Heather Helaine Jones
Represented By: William Peerce Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Longo
Represented By: Amanda J. Allen
Represented By: Heather Helaine Jones
Represented By: William Peerce Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Spatz
Represented By: Amanda J. Allen
Represented By: Heather Helaine Jones
Represented By: William Peerce Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campus Advantage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campus Advantage, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Levine
Represented By: S. Jonathan Vine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?