Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. v. Jovita Carranza, et al
Appellee: The United States of America, Philips Healthcare, Everbank TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc., USF Federal Credit Union and Achieva Credit Union
Appellant: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A., Jovita Carranza, United States Small Business Administration and United States of America
In Re: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. and PM Radiology, LLC.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01420
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by USF Federal Credit Union Appellant's Motion to Transfer and Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murray, Megan)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Zeichman on behalf of Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. and PM Radiology, LLC. (Zeichman, Thomas)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jovita Carranza, United States Small Business Administration, United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Emden, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:20-ap-00330-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 06/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal of Amened Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion, #3 Exhibit Order)(LD)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 6/26/2020. (SRC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-04971-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 06/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. v. Jovita Carranza, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: The United States of America
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Philips Healthcare
Represented By: Steven J. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Everbank TIAA Commercial Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Bret Zwiebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: USF Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Brad Wilson Hissing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Achieva Credit Union
Represented By: Lynn Welter Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jovita Carranza
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States Small Business Administration
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. and PM Radiology, LLC.
Represented By: Thomas G. Zeichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?