Debord v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Plaintiff: Tiffany M. Versakos Debord
Defendant: Daniel I Samp, Purpose Insurance Agency, Inc., The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut and Daniel I. Samp
Case Number: 8:2020cv01450
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's "Amended Motion to Remand" (Doc. #21), her "Motion to Remand" (Doc. #11) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/18/2020. (ANL)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. (Marino, Stephen)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's "Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Remand" (Doc. #19) is granted. Plaintiff may file an amended motion to remand on or before August 21, 2020. Defendant Hartford is directed to respond within 10 days of the filing of the amended motion. Due to the nature of the amendment, Defendant Daniel Samp is not required to file a new response but may do so within 10 days of the filing of the amended motion if he so chooses. The Court will otherwise consider Samp's previously-filed response. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/14/2020. (ANL)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. (Marino, Stephen)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: The "Joint Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone for the Case Management Conference" (Doc. #17) is granted. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/12/2020. (ANL)
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Maria E. Dennison and Laura Besvinick to appear telephonically Case Management Conference by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. (Marino, Stephen)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff's "Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings" (Doc. #12) is hereby denied. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/7/2020. (ANL)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS filed by Daniel I. Samp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JNB)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Remand" (Doc. #13) is hereby granted. Defendant may file its response on or before August 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/4/2020. (ANL)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Remand by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (Besvinick, Laura)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. (Marino, Stephen)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. (Marino, Stephen)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. Related case(s): yes (Marino, Stephen)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by Tiffany M. Versakos Debord. (Marino, Stephen)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Standard Fire Insurance Company for The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut.. (Besvinick, Laura)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. Related case(s): yes (Besvinick, Laura)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut.(Besvinick, Laura)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 6/26/2020. (SRC)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint" (Doc. #3) is hereby granted. Defendant may file its responsive pleading on or before July 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 6/25/2020. (ANL)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal Defendant The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (Besvinick, Laura)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8;20-cv-1450-T-60TGW. (SJB)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendant's Notice of Removal Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 and 1446 from the Twelfth Judicial Circuit, in and for Sarasota County, FL, case number 20-CA-001926 filed in State Court on 04/30/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-16980353 filed by The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court COMPLAINT, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 State Court Other Documents, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 State Court Other Documents. Besvinick, Laura) Modified on 6/25/2020 (TDC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Debord v. The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany M. Versakos Debord
Represented By: Maria E. Dennison
Represented By: Stephen A. Marino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel I Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purpose Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Automobile Insurance Company of Hartford, Connecticut
Represented By: Laura E. Besvinick
Represented By: Cristina Boullon Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel I. Samp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?