Belmer v. EZPawn Florida, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Tereik Belmer
Defendant: Ezcorp Inc., EZPawn Florida, Inc. and EZPawn Florida, Inc. doing business as Value Pawn and Jewelry
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2020cv01470
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 21 Defendants' Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc..(Owens, Brett)
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses by Tereik Belmer. (Feldman, Mitchell)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/6/2020. (TWL)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #17), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/6/2020. (TWL)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the August 2021 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 3/26/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/6/2020. (TWL)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Tereik Belmer. (Feldman, Mitchell)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Owens, Brett)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Froman on behalf of EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc. (Froman, Andrew)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc. Related case(s): No (Owens, Brett)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc. (Owens, Brett)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc. Related case(s): No (Owens, Brett)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc.(Owens, Brett)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tereik Belmer. Related case(s): no (Feldman, Mitchell)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by August 4, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/8/2020. (SGM)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 06/30/2020 by Tereik Belmer as to Ezcorp Inc. (Feldman, Mitchell)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 06/30/2020 by Tereik Belmer as to EZPawn Florida, Inc. (Feldman, Mitchell)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/30/2020. (TWL)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/30/2020. (TWL)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (MCB)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1470-T-33SPF. (SJB)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EZPawn Florida, Inc., Ezcorp Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16990498) filed by Tereik Belmer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons (EZPawn), #3 Proposed Summons (EZCorp))(Feldman, Mitchell) Modified on 6/29/2020 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belmer v. EZPawn Florida, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezcorp Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Froman
Represented By: Brett Purcell Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZPawn Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZPawn Florida, Inc. doing business as Value Pawn and Jewelry
Represented By: Andrew Froman
Represented By: Brett Purcell Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tereik Belmer
Represented By: Mitchell L. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?