USF Federal Credit Union v. Gateway Radiology Consultants
Appellant: USF Federal Credit Union
In Re: PM Radiology, LLC and Gateway Radiology Consultants P.A.
Interested Party: Lynn Welter Sherman and Steven J. Solomon
Appellee: Gateway Radiology Consultants
Case Number: 8:2020cv01491
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing of Petition for Permission for Direct Appeal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Murray, Megan) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (MCB).
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:20-cv-1491-T-60. Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington no longer assigned to the case. (AG)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #5 Motion to Transfer and Consolidate. Pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b), this case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Judge Thomas P. Barber, with his Honor's consent, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/23/2020. (SGM)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case and Consolidate by USF Federal Credit Union. (Murray, Megan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by USF Federal Credit Union. Related case(s): yes (Murray, Megan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Zeichman on behalf of Gateway Radiology Consultants (Zeichman, Thomas)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY ORDER on appeal received consisting of: CERTIFICATION OF DIRECT APPEAL TO THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE 11th CIRCUIT. (JNB)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by USF Federal Credit Union. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-04971-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal, #2 Order)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USF Federal Credit Union v. Gateway Radiology Consultants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: USF Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: PM Radiology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gateway Radiology Consultants P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Lynn Welter Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Steven J. Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gateway Radiology Consultants
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Represented By: Thomas G. Zeichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?