Dominguez et al v. Barracuda Tackle LLC et al
Plaintiff: Salt Addict, Inc. and Yunior Dominguez
Defendant: David Burton Young, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc. and Barracuda Tackle LLC
Not Classified By Court: Travis Hollifield
Case Number: 8:2020cv01538
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 43 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachment(s): #1 Copy of Complaint) (AG). Modified on 7/7/2020 (AG).
July 7, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE to counsel Calrie M. Marsh of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
July 7, 2020 Filing 41 TRANSFER IN from the Southern District of Florida (Miami). Case assigned to District Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New Case Number: 8:20-cv-1538-T-23AEP. (AG)
July 7, 2020 Filing 40 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-21264. File received electronically
July 7, 2020 Filing 39 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Transfering Case) (drz) (Main Document 39 replaced on 7/7/2020) (drz). (Main Document 39 replaced on 7/7/2020) (drz). [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is Denied and The Case will be Transferred to The United States District Court for The Middle District of Florida. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) filed by Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., Barracuda Tackle LLC, David Burton Young, #36 MOTION for Claim Construction filed by Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., Barracuda Tackle LLC, David Burton Young, #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., Barracuda Tackle LLC, David Burton Young, #19 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., Barracuda Tackle LLC, David Burton Young. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 37 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Travis R. Hollifield. Disposition: Case did not settle.(Hollifield, Travis) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Claim Construction by Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Definition of Semicircular), #2 Exhibit B (Definition of Hollow), #3 Exhibit C (Definition of Pin), #4 Exhibit D (Definition of Insert), #5 Exhibit E (Definition of Collapsible))(Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Reply Statement of Material Facts))(Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Filed filed by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs may file their response to Defendants' #28 Motion on or before Tuesday, May 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/22/2020. (bai) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 32 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Filed by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED ORDER denying #30 Motion for Extension of Time. Setting aside the doubtful merits of Plaintiffs' request for an extension, the request is untimely. Defendants' #28 Motion for Summary Judgment was filed on May 1, 2020, and Plaintiffs' response was therefore due May 15, 2020--before the instant motion was filed. Under these circumstances, the Court may grant a request for additional time only upon a showing of "excusable neglect." Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(B). Plaintiffs have not even acknowledged this neglect in missing the Court's deadline, much less shown that such neglect was excusable. The motion is therefore denied. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/20/2020. (bai) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment Filed by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 Agreed NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Re-Scheduled from 5/19/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Selected/Added Travis Hollifield as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/17/2020 at 11:00 a.m.. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. Responses due by 5/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts, #2 Exhibit Declaration of David Burton Young, #3 Exhibit A (Accused Product Pictures), #4 Exhibit B (Requests for Admission), #5 Exhibit C (Interrogatory Responses))(Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER Scheduling Mediation. The mediation conference in this matter shall be held with Travis Hollifield on May 19, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., at Johnson Dalal, 111 N. Pine Island Road, Suite 103, Plantation, FL 33324. This date shall not be rescheduled outside of the deadline for mediation set forth in the scheduling order without leave of Court. Failure to comply with this Order may result in sanctions. Within five days following the mediation conference, the Mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 2/26/2020. (bai) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Travis Hollifield as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/19/2020 at 11:00 a.m.. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Jury Trial set for 10/13/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Calendar Call set for 10/7/2020 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Mediation Deadline 6/19/2020. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 22 Order to Show Cause, by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. (Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Parties have failed to file a Joint Scheduling Report, as required by the Court's #7 Order. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that no later than October 23, 2019, the Parties shall: (a) file a Joint Scheduling Report; and (b) show cause why sanctions should not be entered. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/22/2019. (smz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER REFERRING #19 Motion for Sanctions. The #19 Motion is hereby referred to the Honorable Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/16/2019. (smz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) filed by Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (C&D Letter), #2 Exhibit B (Cited Reference by USPTO))(Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6), #16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) filed by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. Replies due by 10/15/2019. (Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the #15 Motion to Dismiss no later than October 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/1/2019. (smz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
September 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3) and 12(b)(6) by Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. Responses due by 9/30/2019 (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Abdul-Sumi Dalal on behalf of Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. Attorney Abdul-Sumi Dalal added to party Barracuda Tackle LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Abdul-Sumi Dalal added to party Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Abdul-Sumi Dalal added to party David Burton Young(pty:dft). (Dalal, Abdul-Sumi) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Johnson on behalf of Barracuda Tackle LLC, Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc., David Burton Young. Attorney Mark Christopher Johnson added to party Barracuda Tackle LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Christopher Johnson added to party Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Christopher Johnson added to party David Burton Young(pty:dft). (Johnson, Mark) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to Show Cause by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. (Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. David Burton Young served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc. served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc.. Barracuda Tackle LLC served on 4/30/2019, answer due 5/21/2019. (Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 7/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (smz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to David Burton Young. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc.. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Barracuda Tackle LLC. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11531409, filed by Yunior Dominguez, Salt Addict, Inc. D/B/A Ballyhoop. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Summon(s) Summons Barracuda, #4 Summon(s) Summons FFTM, #5 Summon(s) Summons Young)(Marsh, Calrie) [Transferred from flsd on 7/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominguez et al v. Barracuda Tackle LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt Addict, Inc.
Represented By: Calrie M. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yunior Dominguez
Represented By: Calrie M. Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Burton Young
Represented By: Mark Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Abdul-Sumi C. Dalal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Fishing Tackle MFG. CO., Inc.
Represented By: Mark Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Abdul-Sumi C. Dalal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barracuda Tackle LLC
Represented By: Mark Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Abdul-Sumi C. Dalal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Travis Hollifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?