All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. v. Small Business Administration et al
Defendant: Jovita Corranza
Appellant: All Sorts of Services of America, Inc.
Appellee: Small Business Administration
Case Number: 8:2020cv01552
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL to bankruptcy court forwarding #5 Order on Motion to Withdraw Reference Copies sent to Trustee, Bankruptcy Judge and Bankruptcy Clerk. (LD)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #1 Defendants' Motion for Mandatory Withdrawal of Reference. The Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court is DIRECTED to transfer the file to the Clerk of this Court. The Clerk of this Court is thereafter DIRECTED to open a new matter as a civil case and assign it under the blind filing system established pursuant to the rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/17/2020. (MWC)
July 13, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by All Sorts of Services of America, Inc.. (Cole, Richard)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/24/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/10/2020. (KAC)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. to file an expedited response to the United States' Motion for Mandatory Withdrawal of Reference. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion on or before July 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/9/2020. (MWC)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Small Business Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Sorts of Services of America, Inc. v. Small Business Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: All Sorts of Services of America, Inc.
Represented By: Richard John Cole, II
Represented By: Richard J. Cole, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovita Corranza
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Small Business Administration
Represented By: Christopher John Emden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?