CF Fresh, LLC et al v. Weyand Food Distributors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CF Fresh, LLC and R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc.
Defendant: Mary Anne Lyle, Weyand & Son, Inc., Kathryn E. McPhillips, Richard Andrew Weyand and Weyand Food Distributors, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01559
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER: On August 24, 2020, the Court dismissed this action without prejudice pursuant to a notice of settlement, and it gave the parties 60 days to submit a stipulated form of final judgment, request an extension of time, or move to reopen the case for good cause shown. (Doc. 18). On August 26, 2020, the parties filed a "Stipulation for Order Extending Time to Reopen Case." (Doc. #19). The Court construes this filing as a motion and extends the deadline for the parties to seek to reopen the case to December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/27/2020. (ANL)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re 18 Order dismissing case for Order Extending Time to Reopen Action by CF Fresh, LLC. (Nurenberg, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: On the basis of the "Joint Notice of Settlement" (Doc. #17), this cause is hereby dismissed without prejudice, subject to the right of the parties within 60 days of the date hereof, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or request an extension of time, should they so choose, or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause being shown. After that 60 day period, however, without further order, this dismissal shall be deemed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/24/2020. (ANL)
August 24, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of settlement -JOINT by CF Fresh, LLC (Nurenberg, Steven)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/19/2020. (SRC)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading" (Doc. #12) is hereby granted. Defendants may file their responsive pleading on or before August 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (ANL)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and the "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Asserted by Plaintiff, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. -Only-" (Doc #11), Plaintiff R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc's claims against Defendants are dismissed. The Clerk is directed to terminate Plaintiff R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. as a party to this action. Plaintiff CF Fresh, LLC's claims against Defendants remain pending. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (ANL)
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Whittemore, Donald)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2020 by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. as to Kathryn E. McPhillips. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 07/13/2020 by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. as to Mary Anne Lyle. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 07/14/2020 by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. as to Weyand Food Distributors, Inc.. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 07/14/2020 by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. as to Weyand & Son, Inc.. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 07/14/2020 by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. as to Richard Andrew Weyand. (Nurenberg, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Mary Anne Lyle, Kathryn E. McPhillips, Richard Andrew Weyand, Weyand & Son, Inc., Weyand Food Distributors, Inc. (TDC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1559-T-60CPT. (SJB)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Nurenberg, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2020 (TDC).
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by CF Fresh, LLC, R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc. (Nurenberg, Steven) Modified on 7/9/2020 (TDC).
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17034039) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Weyand Food Distributors, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons Weyand & Son, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Richard Andrew Weyand, #5 Proposed Summons Kathryn E. McPhillips, #6 Proposed Summons Mary Anne Lyle)(Nurenberg, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CF Fresh, LLC et al v. Weyand Food Distributors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Anne Lyle
Represented By: Donald H. Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyand & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Donald H. Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn E. McPhillips
Represented By: Donald H. Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrew Weyand
Represented By: Donald H. Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weyand Food Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Donald H. Whittemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CF Fresh, LLC
Represented By: Steven Elwyn Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Walker Tomato Repacker, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Elwyn Nurenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?