Roach v. Bush Ross, P.A.
Plaintiff: Kyle Roach
Defendant: Bush Ross, P.A.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01651
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Bush Ross, P.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Falcone, Vincent) Modified on 9/3/2020 (TDC).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Responding to Class Action Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including September 2, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/6/2020. (MWC)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Robyn Michelle Kramer on behalf of Bush Ross, P.A. (Kramer, Robyn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bush Ross, P.A.. Related case(s): no (Falcone, Vincent)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Bush Ross, P.A.. (Falcone, Vincent)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Bush Ross, P.A.. (Falcone, Vincent)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Falcone, III on behalf of Bush Ross, P.A. (Falcone, Vincent)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kyle Roach. Related case(s): No (Johnson, Jesse)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kyle Roach. (Johnson, Jesse)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 07/22/2020 by Kyle Roach as to Bush Ross, P.A.. (Johnson, Jesse)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/21/2020. (KAC)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/21/2020. (KAC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bush Ross, P.A. (CRH)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-1651-T-35TGW. (SJB)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bush Ross, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17072815) filed by Kyle Roach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 23, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Johnson, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. Bush Ross, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bush Ross, P.A.
Represented By: Vincent Falcone, III
Represented By: Robyn Michelle Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Roach
Represented By: Jesse S. Johnson
Represented By: James L. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?