Solares v. Faia et al
Plaintiff: Sigmund Solares
Defendant: Faia Development Group, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC, Faia & Associates, LLC, ADS Squared, LLC, Michael A. Gardner and Gregory G. Faia
Cross Defendant: Snow Turtles, Ltd, The Producers, Inc., Parked.com, Ltd and Directnic, Ltd.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01674
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties should inform the Court via a filing whether any judicial labor is presently necessary on this case number. If not, the Court will administratively close the case, subject to any party reopening it by motion when/as needed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/8/2020. (Jung, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 8/18/2020 re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Faia & Associates, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, DNC Holdings, Inc, Domain Apps, LLC, ADS Squared, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC, Vernon Decossas. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (SAO)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. The Court appreciates the parties' positions stated at the hearing. The matter is preserved, and may be taken up at a later time when the subject matter is fully ripe. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/18/2020. (Jung, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of supplemental authority in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of Adversary Proceeding (Doc. 1-6) by Sigmund Solares. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Court Order)(Berman, Steven)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: As a reminder, the hearing tomorrow is telephonic, not in person. Each interested party should be represented on the call. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/17/2020. (Jung, William)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10, #11, #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Michael W. Magner, Peter J. Kee, and Andrew R. Lee may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/6/2020. (MLM)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC re #10 MOTION for Michael W. Magner to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17115365 for $150 , 13 Order directing compliance (SUPPLEMENT). (McCoy, Kevin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC re #11 MOTION for Peter J. Kee to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17115459 for $150 , 13 Order directing compliance (SUPPLEMENT). (McCoy, Kevin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC re #12 MOTION for Andrew R. Lee to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17115479 for $150 , 13 Order directing compliance (SUPPLEMENT). (McCoy, Kevin)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER re: #10, #11, #12 motions to appear pro hac vice. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a), M.D. Fla., counsel must be "member[s] in good standing of the bar of any District Court of the United States; outside Florida," in order to be granted pro hac vice admission. Counsel must supplement the record with a notice identifying their U.S. District Court admissions by August 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 7/31/2020. (MLM)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Andrew R. Lee to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17115479 for $150 by ADS Squared, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC. (McCoy, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Peter J. Kee to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17115459 for $150 by ADS Squared, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC. (McCoy, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael W. Magner to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17115365 for $150 by ADS Squared, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC. (McCoy, Kevin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 COUNSEL(S) NOTIFIED TO FILE MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AND PAY FILING FEE FOR EACH COUNSEL AND ADD THEMSELVES TO THE CASE. NOTICE of Appearance of Michael W. Magner; P.J. Kee; and Andrew R. Lee of Jones Walker Appearance by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC (Kirk, Donald) Modified on 7/29/2020 (BSN).
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin P. McCoy on behalf of Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC (McCoy, Kevin)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Kirk on behalf of Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC (Kirk, Donald)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Gilbert on behalf of ADS Squared, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC (Gilbert, Adam)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Underwood on behalf of ADS Squared, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC (Underwood, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Herbert Roy Donica on behalf of Michael A. Gardner (Donica, Herbert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Berman on behalf of Sigmund Solares (Berman, Steven)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2020 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the #(pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 1674 followed by the #(pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:00 AM so the hearing may start promptly at 9:30 AM. (CCB)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdrawal Reference to District Court by ADS Squared, LLC, DNC Holdings, Inc, Vernon Decossas, Domain Apps, LLC, Gregory G. Faia, Faia & Associates, LLC, Faia Development Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 DE 63 Memorandum in Support Part One, #2 DE 63 Memorandum in Support Part Two, #3 DE 63 Memorandum in Support Part Three, #4 DE 63 Memorandum in Support Part Four, #5 DE 73 Order granting Motion Extension of Time, #6 DE 79 Response in Opposition Solares, #7 DE Response in Opposition Gardner, #8 Transmittal, #9 Docket Sheet)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solares v. Faia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Snow Turtles, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: The Producers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Parked.com, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Directnic, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faia Development Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Donald R. Kirk
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNC Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Ryan French
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Decossas
Represented By: Ryan French
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domain Apps, LLC
Represented By: Ryan French
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faia & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Donald R. Kirk
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADS Squared, LLC
Represented By: Ryan French
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Scott Underwood
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Represented By: Adam M. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Gardner
Represented By: Herbert Roy Donica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory G. Faia
Represented By: Michael W. Magner
Represented By: Donald R. Kirk
Represented By: Kevin P. McCoy
Represented By: Andrew Russell Lee
Represented By: Peter J. Kee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sigmund Solares
Represented By: Seth P. Traub
Represented By: Steven M. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?