Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. v. USF Federal Credit Union
Appellant: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
In Re: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. and PM Radiology, LLC.
Appellee: USF Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 8:2020cv01716
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Cases associated: Create association to 8:20-cv-01420-TPB. (LD)
September 15, 2020 Remark: ALL FUTURE CASE PAPERS WILL BE ENTERED ON THE DOCKET SHEET FOR CASE# 8:20-cv-01420-T-TPB ONLY AND WILL BE FILED IN THAT CASE FILE. (LD)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court consolidates the following related appeals to this instant matter: 8:20-cv-1492, 8:20-cv-1716, and 8:20-cv-1491. Appellant and Cross-Appellants' Initial Briefs of the Consolidated Appeal are due September 29, 2020. Appellee and Cross-Appellees' Responses of the Consolidated Appeal are due October 6, 2020. Appellant and Cross-Appellant's Replies of the Consolidated Appeal are due October 13, 2020. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/14/2020. (LD)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by USF Federal Credit Union. Related case(s): yes (Murray, Megan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. Related case(s): yes (Zeichman, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Zeichman on behalf of Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. (Zeichman, Thomas)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/3/2020. (SRC)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY amended notice of appeal by Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:19-bk-04971-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 07/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit Transmittal)(LD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. v. USF Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.
Represented By: Joel Maurice Aresty
Represented By: Thomas G. Zeichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A. and PM Radiology, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: USF Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Megan Wilson Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?