Lefevre v. CSI Fire Equipment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Lefevre
Defendant: Ray Cranston Sherley and CSI Fire Equipment, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01763
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #8--motion to strike. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/16/2020. (BK)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerk's Default against CSI Fire Equipment, LLC, Ray Cranston Sherley by Justin Lefevre. (Murphy, Heath) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #7 Response by Justin Lefevre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Murphy, Heath)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Complaint filed by CSI Fire Equipment, LLC, Ray Cranston Sherley. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Ray Cranston Sherley/NOTICE by Justin Lefevre Notice of Filing (Murphy, Heath) Modified on 8/18/2020 (CTR).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/3/2020. (GSO)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to CSI Fire Equipment, LLC, Ray Cranston Sherley. (MCB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-1763-T-23TGW. (SJB)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17125088) filed by Justin Lefevre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Murphy, Heath)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefevre v. CSI Fire Equipment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Lefevre
Represented By: Heath C. Murphy
Represented By: Robert S. Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Cranston Sherley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSI Fire Equipment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?