Rudy v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Rudy
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01799
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Joseph E. Rudy. (Graypel, Boris)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Joseph E. Rudy. (Graypel, Boris)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joseph E. Rudy. Related case(s): no (Graypel, Boris)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 09/02/2020 by Joseph E. Rudy as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (Sanders, Craig) Modified on 9/4/2020 (TDC).
August 17, 2020 FEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-17187465 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Boris E. Graypel. (Graypel, Boris)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Boris E. Graypel may appear pro hac vice, subject to the requirement that counsel comply with the email registration requirements of Local Rule 2.01(d), M.D. Fla., within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 8/11/2020. (BEE)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Boris E. Graypel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17165004 for $150 by Joseph E. Rudy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Sanders, Craig) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/7/2020. (CRB)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/21/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/7/2020. (CRB)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (CRH)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1799-T-35AAS. (SJB)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17138543) filed by Joseph E. Rudy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Sanders, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rudy v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wakefield & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Rudy
Represented By: Craig B. Sanders
Represented By: Boris E. Graypel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?