Watkins v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mark Watkins
Defendant: Secretary, US VA Robert Wilkie, United States of America, U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, Robert Wilkie and United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 8:2020cv01802
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kenneth Mark Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim & Denial, #2 Exhibit Investigation & Report)(Andrews, J.)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1. Plaintiff's Original Complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice as a shotgun pleading. 2. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order, which must correct the deficiencies discussed herein. 3. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time provided will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/13/2020. (GLP)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice filing of Notice of Pendency of Other Actions by Kenneth Mark Watkins. (Andrews, J.) COUNSEL TO REFILE DOCUMENT USING CORRECT DOCKETING CODE [NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF RELATED CASES]. Modified on 8/14/2020 (DG).
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Kenneth Mark Watkins. (Andrews, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/24/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/10/2020. (BGS)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/24/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/10/2020. (BGS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America, Robert Wilkie, United States Attorney and United States Attorney General. (CRH)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1802-T-36CPT. (SJB)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing Fee $400 receipt number 113A-17140687) filed by Kenneth Mark Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex 1 Letters to and from V.A., #3 Ex 2 V.A. Police Incident Report, #4 Proposed Summons Atty Gen'l of U.S., #5 Proposed Summons U.S. Atty, V.A., #6 Proposed Summons V.A., Distr Counsel, #7 Proposed Summons V.A., Debt Mgt Ctr, #8 Proposed Summons Tampa U.S. Atty, #9 Proposed Summons Wilkie, Secty of Dept of V.A., #10 Proposed Summons US VA, Washington, DC)(Andrews, John) Modified on 8/5/2020 (CRH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Mark Watkins
Represented By: John W. Andrews
Represented By: J. Troy Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, US VA Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?