Display Technologies, LLC v. Audio Partnership, LLC
Plaintiff: Display Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Audio Partnership, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01828
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File.The case management report is due by October 21, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/30/2020. (Covington, Virginia)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Display Technologies, LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Audio Partnership, LLC's unopposed Motion for Extension to File Answer is granted. (Doc. #14). Response now due October 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/16/2020. (AR)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Display Technologies, LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Display Technologies, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management for Display Technologies, LLC. (O'Connor, Edward)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Display Technologies, LLC. Related case(s): yes (O'Connor, Edward)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by September 30, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/19/2020. (AR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by Display Technologies, LLC as to Audio Partnership, LLC. (LNR)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: On August 17, 2020, Defendant Audio Partnership, LLC, sent an e-mail to Chambers requesting an extension of time to file an answer. This is wholly inappropriate, as parties should not contact the Judge directly. Under Local Rule 3.01(g), a party seeking an extension of time must confer in good faith with opposing counsel before filing such a motion. In an abundance of fairness, the Court will extend the deadline to answer Plaintiff Display Technologies, LLC's complaint by 30 days. Response now due September 16, 2020. Audio Partnership, LLC, is reminded that under Local Rule 2.03(e), corporations must be represented by counsel. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/17/2020. (AR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Display Technologies, LLC (O'Connor, Edward)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/10/2020. (TWL)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/10/2020. (TWL)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MCB)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Jay B. Johnson of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Audio Partnership, LLC. (MCB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Statement by Display Technologies, LLC.(MCB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Audio Partnership, LLC with Jury Demand. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA061578 ) filed by Display Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Display Technologies, LLC v. Audio Partnership, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Display Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Represented By: Edward O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audio Partnership, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?