RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Silent Partner Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Silent Partner Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01829
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and the "Joint Stipulation of Dismissal" (Doc. #18), all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this action are dismissed with prejudice and all claims asserted by Defendant in this action are dismissed without prejudice, with all parties to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/23/2020. (EKB)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: "Silent Partner Technologies, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim" (Doc. #14) is hereby denied as moot in light of Defendant's answer to the complaint. See (Doc. #15); see, e.g., Gaby's Bags, LLC v. Mercari, Inc., No. 2:19-cv-785-FtM-38MRM, 2020 WL 495215, at *6 (M.D. Fla. Jan. 30, 2020) (collecting cases). Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/9/2020. (EKB)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against RFID Technology Innovations, LLC by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC.(Barnett, Eleanor)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Trotman Barnett on behalf of Silent Partner Technologies, LLC (Barnett, Eleanor)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. Related case(s): yes (O'Connor, Edward)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management for RFID Technology Innovations, LLC.. (O'Connor, Edward)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC as to Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (O'Connor, Edward)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC (O'Connor, Edward) NOTE: Counsel notified to refile using correct event code; summons returned executed. Modified on 8/21/2020 (LD).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/17/2020. (SRC)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Jay B. Johnson of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MCB)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (MCB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Statement by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC.(MCB)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Silent Partner Technologies, LLC with Jury Demand. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA061577 ) filed by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Silent Partner Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RFID Technology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Represented By: Edward O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silent Partner Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Eleanor Trotman Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?