Martino Batts v. Corizon Health Care Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lamont T. Martino Batts
Defendant: Corizon Health Care Inc., Carl Youngs, Doctor Wetter and J. Rudolph Gordon
Case Number: 8:2020cv01883
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER denying #6 motion for Discovery. The motion is procedurally improper. If Plaintiff receives leave to proceed in forma pauperis, he will be required to seek discovery in the manner set forth in Fed. Rules. Civ. Procedure., which should be available in any law library, and most general public libraries. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/1/2020. (Jung, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery by Lamont T. Martino Batts. (BES)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lamont T. Martino Batts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(CRH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Lamont T. Martino Batts. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/19/2020. (SAO)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Lamont T. Martino Batts. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corizon Health Care Inc., J. Gordon Rudolph, Doctor Wetter, Carl Youngs filed by Lamont T. Martino Batts. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martino Batts v. Corizon Health Care Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont T. Martino Batts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Care Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Youngs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Wetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rudolph Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?