Grant Love v. Northside Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Grant Love
Defendant: St. Petersburg Hospital, Northside Hospital and Pinellas County Jail
Case Number: 8:2020cv01906
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Daniel T. Grant Love. Related case(s): no (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/21/2020. (Flynn, Sean)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/2/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/19/2020. (BGS)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Daniel T. Grant Love. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Northside Hospital, Pinellas County Jail, St. Petersburg Hospital filed by Daniel T. Grant Love. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant Love v. Northside Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Petersburg Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northside Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinellas County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel T. Grant Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?