McGary v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Bradney Henry McGary
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv01914
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bradney Henry McGary. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bradney Henry McGary. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(JLD)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/8/2020. (TWL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of service by Bradney Henry McGary re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thelwell, Lisa)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to Bradney Henry McGary's Motion to Vacate. (Doc. #1). Response due by September 1, 2020. McGary may have 25 days to reply to the response. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/18/2020. (AR)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 8:18-cr-78-T-33TGW filed by Bradney Henry McGary. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGary v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradney Henry McGary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lisa Marie Thelwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?