LoRusso v. McCabe et al
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony LoRusso
Defendant: Robert Bruce, Bernie McCabe and Elizabeth Zuroweste
Case Number: 8:2020cv01916
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying construed motion for reconsideration #9 filed by Michael Anthony LoRusso. The earlier imposed deadline for submitting the initial installment of $7.00 is extended to 11/23/2020. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the Administrator of the Inmate Trust Fund Account, c/o Pinellas County Sheriff's Office, 14400 49th Street, North, Clearwater, Florida 33762. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/29/2020. (SRC)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Michael Anthony LoRusso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to the extent that the action may proceed without prepayment of the entire filing fee. The agency having custody of Plaintiff must submit the initial installment of $7.00 within 45 days. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order and the Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate to Administrator of the Inmate Trust Fund Account. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/17/2020. (SRC) Modified on 9/18/2020 (SRC).
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Anthony LoRusso. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Michael Anthony LoRusso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Clerk to send Plaintiff a "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form (attached to order). No later than 10/12/2020, Plaintiff must either file a fully completed "Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate" form or pay the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/1/2020. (SRC)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/1/2020. (SRC)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to parties re: Case converted to a civil case. New Case Number 8:20-cv-1926-T-30JSS. (LSS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Michael Anthony LoRusso. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Bruce, Bernie McCabe, Elizabeth Zuroweste filed by Michael Anthony LoRusso. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LoRusso v. McCabe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernie McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Zuroweste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Anthony LoRusso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?