Hardy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Michael Hardy
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2020cv01924
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel on 10/08/2020 by Michael Hardy. (CRH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service as to Attorney General of the United States on 10/08/2020 by Michael Hardy. (CRH)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Hardy. United States Attorney served on 10/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (CRH)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (LNR)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on September 1, 2020. (TLM)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Hardy. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2020. (TWL)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (CRH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-1924-T-33JSS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Michael Hardy. (Steinberg, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Michael Hardy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hardy
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?