First Mercury Insurance Company v. First Florida Building Corporation et al
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC and Gilberto Sanchez
Case Number: 8:2020cv01929
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY'S DUTY TO INDEMNIFY filed by First Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Levy, Joshua)
October 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by Gilberto Sanchez re #18 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint Declaration Regarding Plaintiff First Mercury Insurance Company's Duty to Indemnify Notice of Joinder (Gunn, Lee) Modified on 10/9/2020 (DG).
October 9, 2020 Filing 27 Defendant Sanchez's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against First Mercury Insurance Company by Gilberto Sanchez.(Gunn, Lee)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies noted herein. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/7/2020. (GLP)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion to Waive In Person Meeting Requirement for Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/6/2020. (GLP)
October 6, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically waive in person meeting requirement for case management conference by First Mercury Insurance Company. (Levy, Joshua) Modified on 10/6/2020 (DG).
October 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gilberto Sanchez. Related case(s): yes (Gunn, Lee)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Motion to Strike #16 MOTION to Dismiss or to Stay, and #17 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement. The Clerk is directed to strike the documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 10/2/2020. (BEE)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Gilberto Sanchez. (Gunn, Lee)
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Strike #17 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STRIKE D.E. 16 AND D.E. 17 by First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC. (Gudaitis, Christine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 1, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against First Mercury Insurance Company by First Florida LLC, First Florida Building Corporation.(Gudaitis, Christine)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF FIRST MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY'S DUTY TO INDEMNIFY by First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Travelers v Anda order)(Gudaitis, Christine)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 STRICKEN, PURSUANT TO ORDER 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC. (Gudaitis, Christine) THIS ITEM FILED IN WRONG CASE. Modified on 10/1/2020 (DG). Modified on 10/2/2020 (DG).
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 STRICKEN, PURSUANT TO ORDER 22 MOTION to Dismiss OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint DECLARATION REGARDING PLAINTIFF SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY'S DUTY TO INDEMNIFY by First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC. (Gudaitis, Christine) THIS ITEM FILED IN WRONG CASE. Modified on 10/1/2020 (DG). Modified on 10/2/2020 (DG).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Gilberto Sanchez's response due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/28/2020. (BEE)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Gilberto Sanchez. (Gunn, Lee) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. First Florida's response to the complaint due 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 9/15/2020. (BEE)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC. (Gudaitis, Christine)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF by First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC. (Gudaitis, Christine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 08/27/2020 by First Mercury Insurance Company as to Gilberto Sanchez. (Levy, Joshua)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 08/27/2020 by First Mercury Insurance Company as to First Florida LLC. (Levy, Joshua)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 8/27/2020 by First Mercury Insurance Company as to First Florida Building Corporation. (Levy, Joshua)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by First Mercury Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holding Group, Other Affiliate United States Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate First Mercury Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Gilberto Sanchez, Other Affiliate Fairfax (US) Inc., Other Affiliate Crum & Forster Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate FFHL Group, Ltd., Other Affiliate Josh Levy, Esq, Other Affiliate First Florida Building Corporation, Other Affiliate First Florida LLC for First Mercury Insurance Company.. (Levy, Joshua)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by First Mercury Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Levy, Joshua)
August 20, 2020 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number 113A-17199657 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Joshua Levy.. (NLC)
August 20, 2020 REFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number 113A-17200968 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Joshua Levy.. (NLC)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC, Gilberto Sanchez. (CRH)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/20/2020. (BGS)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 8/20/2020. (BGS)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:20-cv-1929-T-36AAS. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against First Florida Building Corporation, First Florida LLC, Gilberto Sanchez with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201057) filed by First Mercury Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Levy, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Mercury Insurance Company v. First Florida Building Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Florida Building Corporation
Represented By: Christine A. Gudaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Florida LLC
Represented By: Christine A. Gudaitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Sanchez
Represented By: Lee Delton Gunn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?