Shropshire v. Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp et al
Plaintiff: JUSTIN SHROPSHIRE
Defendant: JOSEPH D. SIMPSON, JESSICA K. SIMPSON, TOWING & AUTO REPAIR MANAGEMENT CORP doing business as Victory Towing and Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp. a Florida corporation doing business as Victory Towing
Case Number: 8:2020cv01931
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment against Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp. by Justin Shropshire. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Norell, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp. (LD)
September 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp. by Justin Shropshire. (Norell, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 8/26/2020 by Justin Shropshire as to Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp.. (Norell, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jessica K. Simpson, Joseph D. Simpson, Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp. (CRH) (CRH).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:20-cv-1931-T-60CPT. (SJB)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17201775) filed by JUSTIN SHROPSHIRE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Norell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shropshire v. Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH D. SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA K. SIMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWING & AUTO REPAIR MANAGEMENT CORP doing business as Victory Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towing & Auto Repair Management Corp. a Florida corporation doing business as Victory Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN SHROPSHIRE
Represented By: Robert S. Norell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?