Donn v. Florida Recovery Agency, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William E. Donn
Defendant: Tina Glover, Clifford G. Glover, Jr. and Florida Recovery Agency, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01946
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Florida Recovery Agency, LLC, Clifford G. Glover, Jr, Tina Glover.(Brinson, J.)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants' "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer" (Doc. #13) is granted. Defendants may file their response on or before October 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/23/2020. (EKB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Florida Recovery Agency, LLC, Clifford G. Glover, Jr, Tina Glover. (Brinson, J.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 09/02/2020 by William E. Donn as to Tina Glover. (Appel, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 09/02/2020 by William E. Donn as to Florida Recovery Agency, LLC. (Appel, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 09/02/2020 by William E. Donn as to Clifford G. Glover, Jr. (Appel, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by William E. Donn. Related case(s): n (Appel, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by William E. Donn. (Appel, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by William E. Donn (Appel, Jeffrey) NOTE: Incorrect event code; counsel notified to re-file selecting: Summons returned executed/un-executed. Modified on 9/17/2020 (LD).
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by William E. Donn (Appel, Jeffrey) NOTE: Incorrect event code; counsel notified to re-file selecting: Summons returned executed/un-executed. Modified on 9/17/2020 (LD).
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by William E. Donn (Appel, Jeffrey) NOTE: Incorrect event code; counsel notified to re-file selecting: Summons returned executed/un-executed. Modified on 9/17/2020 (LD).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/1/2020. (SRC)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Florida Recovery Agency, LLC, Clifford G. Glover, Jr., Tina Glover. (MCB)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:20-cv-1946-T-60TGW. (LRB)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Recovery Agency, LLC, Clifford G Glover, Jr., Tina Glover with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17208084) filed by William E Donn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Florida Recovery Agency, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Clifford Glover, #4 Proposed Summons Tina Glover)(Appel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donn v. Florida Recovery Agency, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Glover
Represented By: J. Kemp Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford G. Glover, Jr.
Represented By: J. Kemp Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Recovery Agency, LLC
Represented By: J. Kemp Brinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Donn
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?