Gainesville Road Community Trust v. Affordable Housing Investments, LLC
Appellant: Gainsville Road Community Trust and Gainesville Road Community Trust
Appellee: Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, One Family Florida Partners, LP and Shawn Austin
Trustee: U.S. Trustee and Steven S Oscher
Case Number: 8:2020cv01988
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #19 Notice of Appeal. (BES)
October 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #18 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Gainesville Road Community Trust. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113A-17439836. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sirianni, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Dismiss Appeal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/30/2020. (CCB)
September 30, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge William F. Jung: MOTION HEARING held on 9/30/2020 re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal filed by One Family Florida Partners, LP, Shawn Austin, and Affordable Housing Investments, LLC. Court Reporter: Tracey Aurelio (SAO)
September 30, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Gainesville Road Community Trust APPELLANT DEBTOR'S FIRST AMENDED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS (Sirianni, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 JOINDER in motion by Steven S Oscher re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by One Family Florida Partners, LP, Shawn Austin, Affordable Housing Investments, LLC . (Fernandez, Lara)
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal APPELLANT DEBTOR'S FIRST AMENDED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Gainesville Road Community Trust. (Sirianni, Robert)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, Shawn Austin, One Family Florida Partners, LP. Related case(s): yes (Anthony, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 08/25/2020. (BES)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume III held on 08/07/2020 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen. (BES)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume II held on 08/03/2020 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen. (BES)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Trial Volume I held on 07/31/2020 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen. (BES)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Gainsville Road Community Trust. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Order on Appeal, #3 4 Statement of Issues on Appeal, #4 5 Appellant Designation, #5 6 Public Docket, #6 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11, #7 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000002_Order_Authorizing_Debtor-In-Possession_to_Operate_Business, #8 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000006_Part_1_Chapter_11_Case_Management_Summary_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Gainesville, #9 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000012_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Gainesv, #10 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000013_Statement_of_Corporate_Ownership_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Gainesville, #11 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000016_Verified_Motion_for_an_Order_Confirming_Termination_of_Automatic_Stay_or_Modification_of_A, #12 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000018_Statement_of_Debtor_Pursuant_to_11_USC_1116, #13 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000023_Order_Conditionally_Granting_Motion_to_Determine_Adequate_Assurance_for_Payment_of_Utility, #14 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000028_Part_1_Emergency_Motion_to_Enforce_the_Automatic_Stay_and_for_Contempt_Sanctions_Against_One_Fami, #15 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000028_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #16 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000030_Part_1_Amended_Voluntary_Petition_Reason_for_Amendment_Correction_of_FEIN_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hanc, #17 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000030_Part_2_Proof_of_Service, #18 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000033_Motion_to_Appoint_Trustee_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on_behalf_of_Affordable_Housing_Investme, #19 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000035_Part_1_Amended_Voluntary_Petition_Reason_for_Amendment_correct_business_status_and_add_related, #20 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000035_Part_2_Proof_of_Service, #21 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000037_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_NATHAN_WHEATLEY_VINCEN, #22 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000039_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_NATHAN_WHEATLEY_VINCEN, #23 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000042_Part_1_Amended_Schedule_D_Includes_addition_or_deletion_of_creditors_to_Schedules_Amended_Sched, #24 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000042_Part_2_Proof_of_Service, #25 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000042_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #26 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000044_Interim_Order_Granting_Adequate_Protection_regarding_Verified_Motion_for_an_Order_Confirmi, #27 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000047_Preliminary_Order_Upon_Consideration_of_Motion_to_Use_Cash_Collateral_Nunc_Pro_Tunc_to_May, #28 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000052_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_May_19_2020_to_May_31_2020_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on, #29 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000054_Part_1_Emergency_Motion_for_Approval_of_Post-Petition_Financing_Request_for_Interim_and_Final_Ord, #30 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000054_Part_2_Exhibit_Term_Sheet, #31 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000054_Part_3_Exhibit_Budget, #32 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000057_Part_1_Supplement_to_Emergency_Motion_to_Enforce_the_Automatic_Stay_and_for_Contempt_Sanctions_Ag, #33 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000057_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #34 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000057_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #35 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000057_Part_4_Exhibit_D, #36 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000057_Part_5_Exhibit_E, #37 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000057_Part_6_Exhibit_C, #38 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000060_Order_Denying_Motion_to_Enforce_the_Automatic_Stay_and_for_Contempt_Sanctions_Against_One, #39 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000061_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Joint_Administration, #40 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000062_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_CALEB_WALSH_DION_HANCOCK_JOHN_ANTHO, #41 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000076_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_NATHAN_WHEATLEY_JOHN_A, #42 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000077_Part_1_Amended_Schedule_AB_Schedule_D_Schedule_EF_Schedule_G_Includes_addition_or_deletion_o, #43 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000077_Part_2_Certificate_of_Service, #44 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000077_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #45 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000078_Motion_for_Protective_Order_Regarding_Subpoena_Issued_to_NTP_Accounting_and_Tax_Services, #46 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000080_Motion_to_Quash_Regarding_Deposition_Duces_Tecum_Issued_to_Wells_Fargo_Bank_National_Assoc, #47 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000087_Response_to_Motion_for_Protective_Order_Regarding_Subpoena_Issued_to_NTP_Accounting_and_Ta, #48 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000090_Part_1_Amended_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #49 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000090_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #50 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000090_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #51 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000090_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #52 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000090_Part_5_Exhibit_D, #53 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000090_Part_6_Exhibit_E, #54 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000094_Part_1_Response_to_Creditors_Verified_Motion_for_Termination_or_Modification_of_Automatic_Stay_a, #55 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000094_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #56 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000095_Part_1_Supplement_to_Emergency_Motion_for_Interim_and_Final_Orders_Authorizing_Debtor-in-Possessi, #57 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000095_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #58 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000095_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #59 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000100_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_VINCENT_ALEXANDER_JOHN_ANTHONY_SHAW, #60 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000109_Part_1_Supplement_to_Emergency_Joint_Motion_to_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Gaines, #61 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000109_Part_2_Exhibit_A, #62 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000109_Part_3_Exhibit_B, #63 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000109_Part_4_Exhibit_C, #64 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000110_Notice_of_Filing_Supplemental_Materials_Relevant_to_Stay_Relief_Motions_and_Trustee_Motion, #65 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000117_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_VINCENT_ALEXANDER_JOHN, #66 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000123_Amended_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_June_1_2020_to_June_30_2020_Filed_by_Dion_R_Ha, #67 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000126_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_VINCENT_ALEXANDER_JOHN_ANTHONY_DION, #68 8-20-bk-03888_Docket_000127_Omnibus_Confidentiality_Order_Granting_in_Part_and_Denying_in_Part_Motion_For_Protective_O)(JN)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Steven S. Oscher as Chapter 11 Trustee for Gainesville Road Community Trust. (Fernandez, Lara) Modified text per counsel on 9/15/2020 (BSN).
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gainsville Road Community Trust. Related case(s): YES (Sirianni, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Gainsville Road Community Trust. (Sirianni, Robert)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC HEARING on #3 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2020 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Counsel are directed to call the reserved conference toll free number at 1-888-557-8511. Enter the access code: 4744914 followed by the #(pound) key. You will be prompted to enter the security code: 1988 followed by the #(pound) key. This conference will be activated at 9:00 AM so the hearing may start promptly at 9:30 AM. (CCB)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, One Family Florida Partners, LP, Shawn Austin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anthony, John)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 8/27/2020. (SAO)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Gainesville Road Community Trust. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:20-bk-03888-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 08/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(BES) Modified on 9/14/2020 (BES).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gainesville Road Community Trust v. Affordable Housing Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gainsville Road Community Trust
Represented By: Dion Robert Hancock
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Sirianni, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gainesville Road Community Trust
Represented By: Dion Robert Hancock
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Sirianni, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affordable Housing Investments, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: One Family Florida Partners, LP
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shawn Austin
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Nathan A. Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Steven S Oscher
Represented By: Lara Roeske Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?