Plum Circle Community Trust et al v. Affordable Housing Investments, LLC et al
Appellant: Plum Circle Community Trust and Gainsville Road Community Trust
Appellee: Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, One Family Florida Partners, LP and SN CAPITAL, LLC
Trustee: Steven S Oscher and Nathan A. Wheatley
Case Number: 8:2020cv01989
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Stay APPELLANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF RELATED CASE ON APPEAL filed by Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, SN CAPITAL, LLC. (Anthony, John)
October 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Related Case on Appeal by Plum Circle Community Trust. (Sirianni, Robert) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (MCB).
October 4, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of supplemental authority in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Affordable Housing Investments, LLC. (Anthony, John)
September 28, 2020 Filing 15 JOINDER in motion by Steven S Oscher re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by One Family Florida Partners, LP, Affordable Housing Investments, LLC . (Fernandez, Lara)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 8/7/20 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 8/3/20 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen. (JNB)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Trial held on 7/31/20 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen. (JNB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Plum Circle Community Trust. (Sirianni, Robert) Modified text on 9/18/2020 (MCB).
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court 8/25/2020. (MCB) Modified text on 9/17/2020 (MCB).
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Affordable Housing Investments, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Anthony, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of Appeal, #2 3 Order on Appeal, #3 4 Statement of Issues on Appeal, #4 5 Appellant Designation, #5 6 Public Docket, #6 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11, #7 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000004_Order_Authorizing_Debtor-In-Possession_to_Operate_Business, #8 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000011_Motion_to_Appoint_Trustee_Filed_by_John_A_Anthony_on_behalf_of_Affordable_Housing_Investme, #9 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000015_Part_1_Chapter_11_Case_Management_Summary_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Plum_Circle, #10 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000015_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #11 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000017_Part_1_Statement_of_Debtor_Pursuant_to_11_USC_1116, #12 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000017_Part_2_Profit__Loss, #13 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000027_Part_1_Amended_Schedule_D_Includes_addition_or_deletion_of_creditors_to_Schedules_Amended_Volun, #14 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000027_Part_2_Proof_of_Service, #15 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000027_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix, #16 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000040_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_CALEB_WALSH_DION_HANCOCK_JOHN_ANTHO, #17 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000043_Notice_of_Deposition_Filed_by_Nicholas_Lafalce_on_behalf_of_Affordable_Housing_Investments, #18 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000057_Order, #19 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000058_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_VINCENT_ALEXANDER_JOHN_ANTHONY_SHAW, #20 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000066_Part_1_Amended_Schedule_G_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Dion_R_Hancock_on_behalf, #21 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000066_Part_2_Proof_of_Service, #22 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000067_Notice_of_Filing_Supplemental_Materials_Relevant_to_Stay_Relief_Motions_and_Trustee_Motion, #23 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000069_Order_Scheduling_Trial_on_Motion_to_Appoint_Trustee, #24 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000073_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_VINCENT_ALEXANDER_JOHN, #25 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000076_Amended_Financial_Reports_for_the_Period_May_31_2020_to_June_30_2020_Filed_by_Dion_R_Ha, #26 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000078_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_VINCENT_ALEXANDER_JOHN_ANTHONY_DION, #27 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_1_to_60_61_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of_SN_Capita, #28 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #29 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_3_Exhibit_2, #30 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_4_Exhibit_3, #31 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_5_Exhibit_4, #32 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_6_Exhibit_5, #33 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_7_Exhibit_6, #34 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_8_Exhibit_7, #35 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_10_Exhibit_9, #36 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_11_Exhibit_10, #37 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_12_Exhibit_11, #38 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_13_Exhibit_12, #39 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_14_Exhibit_13, #40 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_15_Exhibit_14, #41 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_16_Exhibit_15, #42 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_17_Exhibit_16, #43 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_18_Exhibit_17, #44 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_19_Exhibit_18, #45 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_20_Exhibit_19, #46 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_21_Exhibit_20, #47 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_22_Exhibit_21, #48 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_24_Exhibit_23, #49 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_25_Exhibit_24, #50 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_26_Exhibit_25, #51 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_27_Exhibit_26, #52 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_28_Exhibit_27, #53 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_29_Exhibit_28, #54 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_30_Exhibit_29, #55 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_31_Exhibit_30, #56 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_32_Exhibit_31, #57 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_33_Exhibit_32, #58 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_34_Exhibit_33, #59 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_35_Exhibit_34, #60 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_36_Exhibit_35, #61 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_37_Exhibit_36, #62 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_38_Exhibit_37, #63 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_39_Exhibit_38, #64 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_40_Exhibit_39, #65 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_41_Exhibit_40, #66 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_42_Exhibit_41, #67 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_43_Exhibit_42, #68 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_44_Exhibit_43, #69 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_45_Exhibit_44, #70 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_46_Exhibit_45, #71 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_47_Exhibit_46, #72 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_48_Exhibit_47, #73 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_49_Exhibit_48, #74 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_50_Exhibit_49, #75 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_51_Exhibit_50, #76 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_52_Exhibit_51, #77 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_53_Exhibit_52, #78 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_54_Exhibit_53, #79 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_55_Exhibit_54, #80 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_56_Exhibit_55, #81 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_57_Exhibit_56, #82 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_58_Exhibit_57, #83 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_59_Exhibit_58, #84 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_60_Exhibit_59, #85 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000092_Part_61_Exhibit_60, #86 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_2_Exhibit_61, #87 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_3_Exhibit_62, #88 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_4_Exhibit_63, #89 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_5_Exhibit_64, #90 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_6_Exhibit_65, #91 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_7_Exhibit_66, #92 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_8_Exhibit_67, #93 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_9_Exhibit_68, #94 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_10_Exhibit_69, #95 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_11_Exhibit_70, #96 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_12_Exhibit_71, #97 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_13_Exhibit_72, #98 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_14_Exhibit_73, #99 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_15_Exhibit_74, #100 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_16_Exhibit_75, #101 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_17_Exhibit_76, #102 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_18_Exhibit_77, #103 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_19_Exhibit_78, #104 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_20_Exhibit_79, #105 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_21_Exhibit_80, #106 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_22_Exhibit_81, #107 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_23_Exhibit_82, #108 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_24_Exhibit_83, #109 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_25_Exhibit_84, #110 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_26_Exhibit_85, #111 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_27_Exhibit_86, #112 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_28_Exhibit_87, #113 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_29_Exhibit_88, #114 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_30_Exhibit_89, #115 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_31_Exhibit_90, #116 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_32_Exhibit_91, #117 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_33_Exhibit_92, #118 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_34_Exhibit_93, #119 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_35_Exhibit_94, #120 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_36_Exhibit_95, #121 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_38_Exhibit_97, #122 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_39_Exhibit_98, #123 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_40_Exhibit_99, #124 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_41_Exhibit_100, #125 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_42_Exhibit_101, #126 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_43_Exhibit_102, #127 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_44_Exhibit_103, #128 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_45_Exhibit_104, #129 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_46_Exhibit_105, #130 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_47_Exhibit_106, #131 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_48_Exhibit_107, #132 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_49_Exhibit_108, #133 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_50_Exhibit_109, #134 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000093_Part_51_Exhibit_110, #135 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_1_Proposed_Exhibits_ranging_from_111_to_130_21_documents_attached_filed_on_behalf_of_SN_Cap, #136 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_2_Exhibit_111, #137 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_3_Exhibit_112, #138 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_4_Exhibit_113, #139 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_5_Exhibit_114, #140 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_6_Exhibit_115, #141 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_7_Exhibit_116, #142 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_8_Exhibit_117, #143 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_9_Exhibit_118, #144 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_10_Exhibit_119, #145 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_11_Exhibit_120, #146 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_12_Exhibit_121, #147 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_13_Exhibit_122, #148 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_14_Exhibit_123, #149 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_15_Exhibit_124, #150 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_16_Exhibit_125, #151 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_17_Exhibit_126, #152 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_18_Exhibit_127, #153 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_19_Exhibit_128, #154 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_20_Exhibit_129, #155 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000094_Part_21_Exhibit_130, #156 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000106_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_DAVID_KNOX_J_STEVEN_W, #157 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000111_Emergency_Motion_for_Approval_to_Payoff_all_Creditors_and_to_Provide_Surplus_Money_to_Fund, #158 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000117_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_DION_HANCOCK_DAVID_KNOX_JOHN_ANTHON, #159 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000126_Part_1_Notice_of_Appointment_of_Trustee_and_setting_bond_Steven_S_Oscher_added_to_the_case_File, #160 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000126_Part_2_Exhibit_Acceptance_of_Appointment, #161 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000127_Part_1_Application_for_Approval_of_Selection_of_Chapter_11_Trustee_Filed_by_Nathan_A_Wheatley_on, #162 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000127_Part_2_Exhibit_Verified_Statement_of_Steven_S_Oscher, #163 8-20-bk-04249_Docket_000128_Order_Approving_Selection_of_Chapter_11_Trustee)(JN)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lara Roeske Fernandez on behalf of Steven S. Oscher as Chapter 11 Trustee for Plum Circle Community Trust (Fernandez, Lara)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Plum Circle Community Trust. Related case(s): YES (Sirianni, Robert)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal filed by Plum Circle Community Trust. (Sirianni, Robert)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (DUPLICATE ENTRY MADE IN ERROR) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/1/2020. (SRC) Modified on 9/8/2020 (SRC).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/1/2020. (SRC)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Appeal by Affordable Housing Investments, LLC, One Family Florida Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anthony, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Plum Circle Community Trust. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:20-bk-04249-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 8/12/2020. (MCB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2020: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal) (MCB). Modified on text 8/26/2020 (MCB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #2 CORRECTED Bankruptcy Transmittal) (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plum Circle Community Trust et al v. Affordable Housing Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Plum Circle Community Trust
Represented By: Dion Robert Hancock
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Sirianni, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gainsville Road Community Trust
Represented By: Dion Robert Hancock
Represented By: Robert Lawrence Sirianni, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Affordable Housing Investments, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: One Family Florida Partners, LP
Represented By: Nicholas Lafalce
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SN CAPITAL, LLC
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Steven S Oscher
Represented By: Lara Roeske Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Nathan A. Wheatley
Represented By: Nathan A. Wheatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?